Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807179

EP2807179 - USE OF LYSOZYME AS A TAG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MorphoSys AG
Lena-Christ-Strasse 48
82152 Martinsried/Planegg / DE
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / HAERTLE, Stefan
Biberfeldtrasse 3
82291 Mammendorf / DE
02 / JAEGER, Sebastian
Wuermstrasse 15
82166 Graefelfing / DE
03 / DAUBERT, Daniela
Rotwandstrasse 12
82140 Olching / DE
 [2015/39]
Former [2014/49]01 / HAERTLE, Stefan
Adelshofener Strasse 10
82287 Jesenwang / DE
02 / JAEGER, Sebastian
Wuermstrasse 15
82166 Graefelfing / DE
03 / DAUBERT, Daniela
Rotwandstrasse 12
82140 Olching / DE
Representative(s)Hutter, Bernd
MorphoSys AG
Semmelweisstrasse 7
82152 Planegg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Hutter, Bernd
MorphoSys AG
Lena-Christ-Straße 48
82152 Martinsried/Planegg / DE
Application number, filing date13700913.023.01.2013
[2016/16]
WO2013EP51181
Priority number, dateEP2012015209523.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12152095
US201261589408P23.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261589408 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110627
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807179
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807179
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/22, C12N15/62
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON LYSOZYM ALS TAG[2015/45]
English:USE OF LYSOZYME AS A TAG[2014/49]
French:UTILISATION DE LYSOZYME COMME TAG[2015/45]
Former [2014/49]VERWENDUNG VON LYSOZYM ALS ETIKETT
Former [2014/49]UTILISATION DU LYSOZYME COMME ÉTIQUETTE
Entry into regional phase07.08.2014National basic fee paid 
07.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
23.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
07.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2016Fee for grant paid
22.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2015
Opposition(s)23.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13]
Request for further processing for:07.05.2015Request for further processing filed
07.05.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.05.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.01.2013
AL20.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU23.01.2013
AL20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/47]EE20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/37]EE20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/11]EE20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/10]EE20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/51]HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/50]HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
Former [2016/49]LT20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
Former [2016/46]LT20.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO0100855  (PPL THERAPEUTICS SCOTLAND LTD [GB]; COTTINGHAM IAN ROBERT [GB]; MCCREA) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 20 - page 11, line 9 * * example - * [I] 11-13;
 [Y]EP0332323  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [Y] 11-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - SMITH-GILL S J ET AL, "A three-dimensional model of an anti-lysozyme antibody", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 194, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0022-2836(87)90249-X, ISSN 0022-2836, (19870420), pages 713 - 724, (19870420), XP024009604 [Y] 11-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(87)90249-X
by applicantWO03057174
 WO0021381
 WO2004026334
 WO2005080559
 US7428273
 EP0425016
 US6279536
 WO2004017988
 WO2008124764
 WO0100855
 WO2009051769
    - HUGHEY; JOHNSON, APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (1987), vol. 53, page 2165
    - STREULI; BISSELL, THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 110
    - FURTH ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1991), vol. 19, page 6205
    - WHITELAW ET AL., TRANSGENIC RES., (1991), vol. 1, page 3
    - THOMPSON, J.D.; HIGGINS, D.G.; GIBSON, T.J., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (200012), vol. 3
    - Current Protocols in Protein Science, WILEY INTERSCIENCE
 US20010024597