Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807398

EP2807398 - ADJUSTABLE-LENGTH ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stabilus GmbH
Wallersheimer Weg 100
56070 Koblenz / DE
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / BOCHEN, Jan
Kastanienweg 1
56337 Eitelborn / DE
02 / WOLF, Jörg
Erlenweg 10
56220 Urmitz / DE
03 / THEIS, Christof
Emserstrasse 22
56204 Hillscheid / DE
04 / LANGE, Danniel
Vasile Saftu 13
500127 Brasov / RO
 [2018/02]
Former [2014/49]01 / BOCHEN, Jan
Unterdorfstraße 33
56337 Eitelborn / DE
02 / WOLF, Jörg
Erlenweg 10
56220 Urmitz / DE
03 / THEIS, Christof
Emserstrasse 22
56204 Hillscheid / DE
04 / LANGE, Danniel
Vasile Saftu 13
R-500127 Brasov / RO
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[2018/02]
Former [2014/49]Herzog, Markus , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date13700915.523.01.2013
[2018/02]
WO2013EP51201
Priority number, dateDE20121020117427.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012201174
[2014/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110636
Date:01.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807398
Date:03.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807398
Date:10.01.2018
Language:DE
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16F9/54
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LÄNGENVERÄNDERBARES AGGREGAT[2014/49]
English:ADJUSTABLE-LENGTH ASSEMBLY[2014/49]
French:ENSEMBLE RÉGLABLE EN LONGUEUR[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
20.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2017Fee for grant paid
27.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2017
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
AT23.01.2018
IE23.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GB10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/13]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE23.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GB10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2019/09]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE23.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/43]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE10046961  (STABILUS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6,9-15 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP1460288  (KYOSHO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5,9-15 * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]JPH09146U  (UBNKNOWN) [Y] 6 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2064640  (TOKICO LTD) [A] 1 * figure 1 *