Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806829

EP2806829 - AN ARRANGEMENT, A LOOP-SHAPED SUPPORT, A PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE AND A METHOD OF REPAIRING OR REPLACING A NATIVE HEART VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtentia International Ltd Oy
Upseerinkatu 1-3, Tower 1
02600 Espoo / FI
[2016/50]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Medtentia International Ltd Oy
Mäkelänkatu 58-60, 3rd Floor
00510 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KERÄNEN, Olli
Anders Möllares Väg 56
23741 Bjärred / SE
 [2016/43]
Former [2014/49]01 / KERÄNEN, Olli
Anders Möllares Väg 56
S-23741 Bjärred / SE
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/43](deleted)
...
Former [2014/49]KIPA AB
P O Box 1065
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Application number, filing date13701096.324.01.2013
[2016/43]
WO2013EP51366
Priority number, dateEP2012015234824.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12152348
US201261590715P25.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261590715 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013110722
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2806829
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806829
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG, SCHLEIFENFÖRMIGE STÜTZE, HERZKLAPPENPROTHESE UND VERFAHREN ZUM REPARIEREN ODER ERSETZEN EINER NATÜRLICHEN HERZKLAPPE[2014/49]
English:AN ARRANGEMENT, A LOOP-SHAPED SUPPORT, A PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE AND A METHOD OF REPAIRING OR REPLACING A NATIVE HEART VALVE[2014/49]
French:AGENCEMENT, SUPPORT EN FORME DE BOUCLE, PROTHÈSE VALVULAIRE CARDIAQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION OU DE REMPLACEMENT DE VALVULE CARDIAQUE NATIVE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
10.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2016Fee for grant paid
12.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.07.2017  02.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
Somerville, Andrew Edward
Somerville Associates
Dunston Innovation Centre
Dunston Road
Chesterfield S41 8NG / GB
 [2019/15]
Former [2018/20]
Opponent(s)01  26.07.2017  02.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
Former [2018/17]
Opponent(s)01  26.07.2017  02.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
Hine House
25 Regent Street
Nottingham NG1 5BS / GB
Former [2017/35]
Opponent(s)01  26.07.2017   
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
01.09.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.01.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.10.2018Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.12.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.02.2019Appeal received No.  T0633/19
29.04.2019Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.01.2013
AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CY26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU24.01.2013
AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
LU24.01.2017
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/42]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV26.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2010076549  (KEIDAR YARON [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,12-14 * paragraphs [0066] , [0078]; figures 6c,9a * [Y] 6,9,10;
 [Y]WO2008058940  (MEDTENTIA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 6,9,10 * page 16, lines 18-21 * * page 25, lines 3-14 * * figures 4,14a *;
 [X]US2006195185  (LANE ERNEST [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-14 * paragraphs [0131] , [0132] , [0174]; figures 11,17b *;
 [X]US2010030014  (FERRAZZI PAOLO [IT]) [X] 1-5,7-9,12-14 * paragraphs [0071] - [0078]; figure 9 *;
 [X]WO0203892  (SPENCE PAUL A [US]) [X] 24-33 * page 14, lines 11-20 * * page 18, line 1 - page 19, line 4 * * figures 8,26,28,30 *;
 [X]US2006195184  (LANE ERNEST [US], et al) [X] 24,25,27-29,33 * paragraphs [0174] , [0177]; figures 17a-19 *;
 [A]WO2004030569  (AMPLE MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 24,33 * page 21, lines 5-25; figure 10 *
by applicantEP1994913
 EP1469797
 EP1259195
 WO2007051620
 WO2007048529
 EP1980220
 WO0164137
 EP1255510
 US5411552
 WO2008058940
 US6419696
 US6730121
 US6964684
 WO2006091163
OppositionUS6419696
 US2002173841
 WO2008058940
 WO0203892
 US2010076549
 US2006195185
 US2009299471
 WO2006091163