Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803230

EP2803230 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING OVERHEAD MESSAGE UPDATES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.03.2016  [2016/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / PATWARDHAN, Ravindra, Manohar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / ATTAR, Rashid Ahmed Akbar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13701171.409.01.2013
WO2013US20861
Priority number, dateUS201261584768P09.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261584768 P
US20131373418704.01.2013         Original published format: US201313734187
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013106453
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803230
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, H04W48/12, // H04W4/12
[2015/24]
Former International [2015/21]H04W52/02, // H04W4/12
Former International [2014/47]H04W52/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VEREINFACHTEN AKTUALISIERUNG VON OVERHEAD-NACHRICHTEN IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN[2014/47]
English:DEVICES AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING OVERHEAD MESSAGE UPDATES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS[2014/47]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS FACILITANT LES MISES À JOUR DE MESSAGES DE SURCHARGE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
14.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/12]
05.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6889067  (WILLEY W DANIEL [US]) [X] 57 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 13 * * column 6, line 54 - column 6, line 66 * [Y] 1-15;
 [Y]US2010067485  (REZAIIFAR RAMIN [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0055] - [0062] - [0065] * * figures 3,4,6 *;
 [IY]US2006268768  (HARRIS JOHN M [US] ET AL) [I] 16,18-21,25-27,29-31,33,34 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0029] - [0031] * [Y] 17,22-24,28,32,36,42,48,52;
 [IY]US2011013598  (JANG KE-CHI [US] ET AL) [I] 35,37,38,41,43,44,47,49-51,53,54 * paragraphs [0035] - [0043] * [Y] 17,22-24,28,32,36,42,48,52;
 [XI]US2009290502  (TINNAKORNSRISUPHAP PEERAPOL [US] ET AL) [X] 35,41,47,51 * paragraphs [0008] , [0030] - [0032] - [0074] * [I] 39,40,45,46,55,56