Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805185

EP2805185 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A FIELD DEVICE, FIELD DEVICE AND SERVER FOR A WIDE-AREA AUTOMATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG
Flachsmarktstrasse 8
32825 Blomberg / DE
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / POLLMANN, Werner
Paradiesweg 3
37671 Höxter / DE
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date13701229.014.01.2013
[2018/40]
WO2013EP50545
Priority number, dateDE20121010035517.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012100355
[2014/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107704
Date:25.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805185
Date:26.11.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805185
Date:03.10.2018
Language:DE
[2018/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01S19/14, H04W4/02, H04L29/12, H04L29/08, G01S5/00
[2018/26]
Former International [2014/48]G01S19/14, G01S5/00, H02J13/00, H04L29/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES FELDGERÄTS, FELDGERÄT UND SERVER FÜR EIN WEITFLÄCHIGES AUTOMATISIERUNGSNETZ[2014/48]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING A FIELD DEVICE, FIELD DEVICE AND SERVER FOR A WIDE-AREA AUTOMATION NETWORK[2014/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN APPAREIL DE TERRAIN, APPAREIL DE TERRAIN, ET SERVEUR POUR UN RÉSEAU D'AUTOMATISATION DE GRANDE SURFACE[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2014National basic fee paid 
11.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
26.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
21.08.2018Fee for grant paid
21.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.12.2017
Opposition(s)04.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
LU14.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]AL03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AL03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/25]CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/24]CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/23]CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/22]CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL03.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2009063680  (BRIDGES SETH W [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-10,13 * figures 1,2,8,11,12 * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0164] *;
 [Y]US2007016312  (REDMOND CHRISTIAN G [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-10,13 * figures 1,6 * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]US2010164749  (HOPE SHAUN [US], et al) [A] 1,7,13 * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [A]US2011015799  (POLLACK SETH B [US], et al) [A] 1,7,13 * figure 9 * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0137] *;
 [A]US2011202185  (IMES KEVIN R [US], et al) [A] 1,7,13 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0097] *
by applicantDE10163564