Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809201

EP2809201 - WASTE COLLECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 12.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ninkaplast GmbH
Benzstrasse 6
32108 Bad Salzuflen / DE
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / WULF, Klaus, Henning
Eduard-Wolff-Str. 6
32108 Bad Salzuflen / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/26]
Former [2014/50]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13701249.823.01.2013
[2018/26]
WO2013EP51238
Priority number, dateDE201220100376U03.02.2012         Original published format: DE 202012100376 U
[2014/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113596
Date:08.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809201
Date:10.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809201
Date:27.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A47B49/00, B65F1/00, B65F1/02, B65F1/14, A47B81/00
[2018/03]
Former International [2014/50]A47B49/00, B65F1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABFALLSAMMELSYSTEM[2014/50]
English:WASTE COLLECTION SYSTEM[2014/50]
French:SYSTÈME DE COLLECTE DE DÉCHETS[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2018Fee for grant paid
16.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2018
Opposition(s)28.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
LU23.01.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/37]CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/26]CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/12]CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/11]CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/03]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/52]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
NO27.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE20306002U  (VAUTH SAGEL GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 5 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-5;
 [YD]EP2253244  (NINKAPLAST GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-5 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]EP0276339  (ALNO MOEBEL [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 20; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]EP1857019  (NINKAPLAST GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-13 *
by applicantDE20019413U
 EP2253244