Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2807195 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2807195



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 122
08.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
08.12.2017 Claims Search / examination 1
08.12.2017 Description Search / examination 4
08.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.12.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.08.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
15.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
02.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
02.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
26.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
13.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
10.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
01.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
19.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2