Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2807195 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380011420 EP13701257



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9120882Global Dossier 01.09.2015B2
US2015005459 01.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51362 24.01.2013
EP12152650 26.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102011167BGlobal Dossier 14.08.2019B1
KR20140116959 06.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51362 24.01.2013
EP12152650 26.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104144951Global Dossier 12.11.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51362 24.01.2013
EP12152650 26.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2807195Global Dossier 03.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51362 24.01.2013
EP13701257 24.01.2013
EP12152650 26.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013110718Global Dossier 01.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP12152650 26.01.2012