Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807195

EP2807195 - PROCESS FOR PURGING PROPANE IN A POLYPROPYLENE MANUFACTURING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / JANSSENS, Els
Driesstraat 35
1770 Liedekerke / BE
02 / AVAULLEE, Laurent
2 Chemin Peyret
64121 Serres-Castet / FR
03 / RICHET, Marc
Chemin de la Vallière 45
SR2
7000 Mons / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]01 / JANSSENS, Els
Driesstraat 35
B-1770 Liedekerke / BE
02 / AVAULLEE, Laurent
2 Chemin Peyret
F-64121 Serres-Castet / FR
03 / RICHET, Marc
Chemin de la Vallière 45
SR2
B-7000 Mons / BE
Representative(s)Raboin, Jean-Christophe , et al
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Leyder, Francis
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Application number, filing date13701257.124.01.2013
WO2013EP51362
Priority number, dateEP2012015265026.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12152650
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110718
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807195
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08F6/00, B01D53/22, B01J19/24, C08F210/06
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SPÜLEN VON PROPAN IN EINEM POLYPROPYLENHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2014/49]
English:PROCESS FOR PURGING PROPANE IN A POLYPROPYLENE MANUFACTURING PROCESS[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PURGE DE PROPANE DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE POLYPROPYLÈNE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.08.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XD]US6271319  (BAKER RICHARD W [US], et al) [XD] 1-8 * column 5, line 29 - column 15, line 5; figure 1; examples 1-10,12-17; claims 1-33 *;
 [X]US2011049051  (COUGARD NATHALIE [FR], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077]; figure 2; claims 1-9 *;
 [XD]WO2009106706  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [XD] 1-8
by applicantUS6271319
 WO2005082957
 WO2008084415
 US2004000513
 US2006266213
 US2004182786
 FR2886646
 WO2009106706
 WO2011037820
    - 1IINITCH, O. M.; SEMIN, G. L.; CHERTOVA, M. V.; ZAMARAEV, K. I., "Novel Polymeric Membranes for Separation of Hydrocarbons", J. MEMBR. SCI., (1992), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1016/0376-7388(92)80085-X, pages 1 - 8, XP000271954

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0376-7388(92)80085-X
    - SHIMAZU, A.; MIYAZAKI, T.; MAEDA, M.; IKEDA, K., "Relationship Between the Chemical Structures and the Solubility, Diffusivity and Perinselectivity of Propylene and Propane in 6FDA-Based Polyimides", J. POLYM. SCI., (2000), vol. 38, pages 2525 - 2536
    - TANAKA, K.; TAGUCHI, A.; HAO, J.; KITA, H.; OKAMOTO, K., "Permeation and Separation Properties of Polyimide Membranes to Olefins and Paraffins", J. MEMBR. SCI., (1996), vol. 121, doi:doi:10.1016/S0376-7388(96)00182-2, page 197, XP004071258

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(96)00182-2