Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809644

EP2809644 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING NITROBENZOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/50]METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING NITROBENZENE
[2016/20]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covestro Deutschland AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2015/45]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Str. 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PENNEMANN, Bernd
Lisztstr. 1
51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
02 / MÜNNIG, Jürgen
Dortmunder Str. 27
41564 Kaarst / DE
03 / DIETRICH, Wulf
Clarenbachstr. 186
50931 Köln / DE
04 / RAUSCH, Andreas, Karl
Rubinweg 17
41564 Kaarst / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Levpat
c/o Covestro AG
Gebäude 4825
51365 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/39]Levpat
c/o Covestro AG
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
Former [2014/50]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Application number, filing date13701282.928.01.2013
[2016/39]
WO2013EP51561
Priority number, dateEP2012015320231.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12153202
[2014/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113651
Date:08.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809644
Date:10.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809644
Date:28.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07C201/08, C07C205/06, C01B17/94, C01B17/88
[2016/20]
Former International [2014/50]C07C201/08, C07C205/06, C01B17/88, C07C201/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NITROBENZOL[2014/50]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING NITROBENZOL[2016/20]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DESTINÉS À LA FABRICATION DE NITROBENZÈNE[2016/20]
Former [2014/50]METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING NITROBENZENE
Former [2014/50]PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION DE NITROBENZÈNE
Entry into regional phase01.09.2014National basic fee paid 
01.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
11.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.08.2016Fee for grant paid
16.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2016
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.01.2013
AL28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MT28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IE28.01.2017
IS28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/47]AL28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MT28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IE28.01.2017
IS28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/43]DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MT28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IE28.01.2017
IS28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/13]DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IE28.01.2017
IS28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/51]DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/50]DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/47]DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
Former [2017/34]DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
Former [2017/32]EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE102009005324  (PLINKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0156199  (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * page 12, line 19 - line 25; example 2; claim - *;
 [AD]US4091042  (ALEXANDERSON VERNER ET AL) [AD] 1-10 * example -; claim - *;
 [AD]DE19636191  (BAYER AG [DE] BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2256999
 US4091042
 US5313009
 US5763697
 DE19636191
 EP0615951
 US2001043894
    - Sulfuric acid und sulfur trioxide, WILEY VCH, (2005), pages 51 - 52