Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809609

EP2809609 - A METHOD OF DISPENSING CARBONATED BEVERAGE, A BEVERAGE DISPENSING SYSTEM AND A COLLAPSIBLE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carlsberg Breweries A/S
Ny Carlsberg Vej 100
1799 Copenhagen V / DK
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / RASMUSSEN, Jan, Nørager
Rytterbakken 22
DK-3650 Ølstykke / DK
02 / VESBORG, Steen
Dronningemarken 4
DK-2820 Gentofte / DK
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Høiberg P/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Nielsen, Henrik Sten
Budde Schou A/S
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date13701286.028.01.2013
WO2013EP51576
Priority number, dateEP2012015387103.02.2012         Original published format: EP 12153871
EP2012015415407.02.2012         Original published format: EP 12154154
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113657
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809609
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B67D1/00, B67D1/04, B67D1/08, B67D1/12
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGABE VON KOHLENSÄUREHALTIGEN GETRÄNKEN, GETRÄNKEABGABESYSTEM UND ZUSAMMENKLAPPBARER BEHÄLTER[2014/50]
English:A METHOD OF DISPENSING CARBONATED BEVERAGE, A BEVERAGE DISPENSING SYSTEM AND A COLLAPSIBLE CONTAINER[2014/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE BOISSON GAZEUSE, SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE BOISSON ET RÉCIPIENT PLIABLE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
09.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2009024147  (CARLSBERG BREWERIES AS [DK]; VESBORG STEEN [DK]; RASMUSSEN JAN NOERAGE) [X] 13 * page 20, line 8 - page 22, line 26; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]DE2736281  (BIER DRIVE AG) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2011002295  (HEINEKEN SUPPLY CHAIN BV [NL]; WOLTHERS WOLTER [NL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *