Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2809944 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2809944



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 143
29.01.2013 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 24
29.01.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4
29.01.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 15
29.01.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
29.01.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
29.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
14.03.2013 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
14.03.2013 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
14.03.2013 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
14.03.2013 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
25.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
25.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
25.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
08.08.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 23
27.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
26.09.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.03.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
10.03.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
19.03.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
03.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
16.09.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
19.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.09.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
27.02.2015 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
21.08.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1