Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2809944


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.08.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
11.05.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
06.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication