Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2809944 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380007200 EP12153101 EP13701292



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015017035Global Dossier 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51674 29.01.2013
EP12153101 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140110085Global Dossier 16.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51674 29.01.2013
EP12153101 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015505011Global Dossier 16.02.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51674 29.01.2013
EP12153101 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104160141Global Dossier 19.11.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51674 29.01.2013
EP12153101 30.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2809944Global Dossier 10.12.2014A2
Priority number Date
WO2013EP51674 29.01.2013
EP13701292 29.01.2013
EP12153101 30.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013113693Global Dossier 26.09.2013A3
WO2013113693 08.08.2013A2
Priority number Date
EP12153101 30.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2620633Global Dossier 31.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP12153101 30.01.2012