Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809944

EP2809944 - PUMP HEAD FOR A FUEL PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.08.2015
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.09.2015  [2015/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi International Operations Luxembourg S.à r.l.
Avenue de Luxembourg
4940 Bascharage / LU
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / MCCRINDLE, Christopher
15 Russett Way
Kings Hill
West Malling Kent ME19 4FJ / GB
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Neill, Andrew Peter
Delphi Diesel Systems
Patent Department
Courteney Road
Gillingham, Kent ME8 0RU / GB
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13701292.829.01.2013
WO2013EP51674
Priority number, dateEP2012015310130.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12153101
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013113693
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2809944
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:F02M59/10, F02M59/44, F04B1/04
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:PUMPENKOPF FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFPUMPE[2014/50]
English:PUMP HEAD FOR A FUEL PUMP[2014/50]
French:TÊTE DE POMPE POUR UNE POMPE À CARBURANT[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2014National basic fee paid 
01.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
04.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/40]
12.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]DE10322598  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6-8,11-13 * paragraphs [0030] , [0034] , [0038]; figures 2,4 * [A] 4;
 [Y]GB1229919  (DONALD WORBY) [Y] 1-3,6-8,11-13 * page 2, lines 3-58; figure 1 *;
 [YA]DE102008002195  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-6,9,11-13 * paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * [A] 7,8,10;
 [YA]WO2009082702  (CATERPILLAR INC [US]; STOCKNER ALAN [US]; SHAFER SCOTT [US]) [Y] 1-6,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0044]; figure 8 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0048]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0054]; figure 10 * [A] 7,8,10;
 [A]EP1975402  (NOK CORP [JP]; DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,9,10,13 * paragraph [0002]; figure 11 *;
 [A]US2001043874  (SANO MASAAKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,5,7,8,11-13 * paragraphs [0041] - [0044]; figure 3 *
by applicantEP1363016