Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805344

EP2805344 - VOLTAGE AND/OR CURRENT SENSING DEVICE FOR LOW-, MEDIUM- OR HIGH VOLTAGE SWITCHING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/42]For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
ABB Technology AG
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / JAVORA, Radek
Ulice Coupkovych 44
624 00 Brno / CZ
02 / RASCHKA, David
Vetrna 12
664 91 Ivancice / CZ
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Karl Michael
ABB AG
GF-IP
Oberhausener Strasse 33
40472 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Schmidt, Karl Michael
ABB AG GF-IP Oberhausener Strasse 33
40472 Ratingen / DE
Application number, filing date13701364.518.01.2013
WO2013EP00145
Priority number, dateEP2012000029819.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12000298
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107647
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805344
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01H71/12, G01R15/04, G01R15/18, H01H33/02, G01R15/14
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:SPANNUNGS- UND/ODER STROMMESSER FÜR NIEDER-, MITTEL- ODER HOCHSPANNUNGSSCHALTVORRICHTUNGEN[2014/48]
English:VOLTAGE AND/OR CURRENT SENSING DEVICE FOR LOW-, MEDIUM- OR HIGH VOLTAGE SWITCHING DEVICES[2014/48]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE TENSION ET/OU DE COURANT DESTINÉ À DES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUTATION À BASSE, MOYENNE OU HAUTE TENSION[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2014National basic fee paid 
11.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
05.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
28.03.2019Request for further processing filed
28.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.04.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2008151937  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,12,13 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,4 * [I] 4-7,11,14;
 [XI]EP0510311  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [X] 1-3,8-10,12,13 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 35; figures 1,2 * [I] 4-7,11,14;
 [A]EP0851442  (ABB TRANSMIT OY [FI]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US5585611  (HARVEY IAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 5, lines 41-56; figure 4 *
by applicantWO2008151937
 EP0510311