blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2805344 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2805344



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 224
05.04.2019 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
01.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
01.04.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
01.04.2019 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
28.03.2019 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
21.01.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
19.10.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
12.10.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
13.06.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.06.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.03.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.09.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 22
07.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
07.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
05.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
29.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
11.07.2014 Annex Search / examination 2
11.07.2014 Annex Search / examination 2
11.07.2014 Annex Search / examination 22
11.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
02.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
25.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
25.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 19
13.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
13.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
12.03.2013 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) PCT receiving Office 1
18.01.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
18.01.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
18.01.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 8
18.01.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 7
18.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1
18.01.2013 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 21