blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2805344


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.04.2019 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
01.04.2019 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
01.04.2019 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
30.03.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2019 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
16.10.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.06.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2018 First examination report
30.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2016 Change - applicant published on  19.10.2016  [2016/42]
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
07.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
28.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication