blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2805344 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP12000298 EP13701364



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9588151Global Dossier 07.03.2017B2
US2014333282 13.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP12000298 19.01.2012
WO2013EP00145 18.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2805344Global Dossier 26.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP12000298 19.01.2012
EP13701364 18.01.2013
WO2013EP00145 18.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN204167231U 18.02.2015U
Priority number Date
EP12000298 19.01.2012
WO2013EP00145 18.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN5844DELNP2014 22.05.2015A
Priority number Date
EP12000298 19.01.2012
WO2013EP00145 18.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013107647Global Dossier 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP12000298 19.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2618356Global Dossier 24.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP12000298 19.01.2012