Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800616

EP2800616 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR OBTAINING DRINKING WATER FROM AN AMBIENT ATMOSPHERE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2016  [2016/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stock, Jürgen
Eitelbrodstrasse 28
38108 Braunschweig / DE
For all designated states
Mahler, Roland
Gossraer Forststrasse 35
06722 Wetterzeube / DE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Lins, Edgar , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Lins, Edgar , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
Application number, filing date13701563.204.01.2013
WO2013EP00013
Priority number, dateDE2012100012906.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012000129
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013102622
Date:11.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800616
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01D5/00, B01D53/00, B01D53/26, E03B3/28
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM GEWINNEN VON TRINKWASSER AUS EINER UMGEBUNGSATMOSPHÄRE[2014/46]
English:PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR OBTAINING DRINKING WATER FROM AN AMBIENT ATMOSPHERE[2014/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'EAU POTABLE À PARTIR D'UNE ATMOSPHÈRE ENVIRONNANTE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase05.08.2014National basic fee paid 
05.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
26.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/41]
01.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201503   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2015
31.01.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2008031161  (VITAL EARTH TECHNOLOGIES PTY L [AU], et al) [X] 1-7,10 * page 1, line 5 - line 9 * * page 14, line 1 - line 5 * * page 14, line 5 - line 6 * * figure 1 * * page 14, line 11 - line 13 * [I] 8,9;
 [XAI]US2002011075  (FAQIH ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDUL-KADER [SA]) [X] 4-7,10 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0099] * [A] 1-3 [I] 8,9