Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807270

EP2807270 - METHOD FOR THE EVALUATION OF THE QUALITY OF A TEST ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / HAAR, Hans-Peter
Waldstrasse 2
69168 Wiesloch / DE
02 / HOENES, Joachim
Rodauer Strasse 50a
64673 Zwingenberg / DE
03 / HORN, Carina
Frankenstrasse 5
68647 Biblis / DE
04 / PETRICH, Wolfgang
Daimlerstr. 10
76669 Bad Schönborn / DE
05 / FREIFRAU VON KETTELER, Alexa
Mozartstrasse 4
89075 Ulm / DE
 [2016/14]
Former [2014/49]01 / HAAR, Hans-Peter
Waldstrasse 2
69168 Wiesloch / DE
02 / HOENES, Joachim
Rodauer Strasse 50a
64673 Zwingenberg / DE
03 / HORN, Carina
Frankenstrasse 5
68647 Biblis / DE
04 / PETERICH, Wolfgang
Daimlerstr. 10
76669 Bad Schönborn / DE
05 / FREIFRAU VON KETTELER, Alexa
Mozartstrasse 4
89075 Ulm / DE
Representative(s)Poredda, Andreas , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Poredda, Andreas , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date13701570.723.01.2013
[2016/14]
WO2013EP00192
Priority number, dateEP2012000047925.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12000479
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110453
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807270
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807270
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/573, C12Q1/54
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/49]C12Q1/54, C12M1/34, G01N33/66
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWERTUNG DER QUALITÄT EINES TESTELEMENTES[2015/33]
English:METHOD FOR THE EVALUATION OF THE QUALITY OF A TEST ELEMENT[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ÉVALUATION DE LA QUALITÉ D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE TEST[2014/49]
Former [2014/49]VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWERTUNG DER QUALITÄT EINES TESTELEMENTS
Entry into regional phase25.08.2014National basic fee paid 
25.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
07.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2016Fee for grant paid
08.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.10.2015
Opposition(s)10.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.01.2013
AL06.04.2016
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU23.01.2013
AL06.04.2016
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL06.04.2016
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/47]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/48]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL06.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010227348  (PETRICH WOLFGANG [DE] ET AL) [X] 16 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; figure -; example -; claim - * [I] 1-15;
 [AD]EP0293732  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [AD] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [XI]WO2009015870  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE & CO AG F) [X] 16 * abstract * [I] 1-15;
 [A]WO2010105850  (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]; HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]; HAAR HANS-PETER [) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]US7857760  (BRISTER MARK [US] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * column 93 - column 95; figure 18a *;
 [A]US6055060  (BOLDUAN FRANZ [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * column 1 - column 3; figure -; claim - *
 [A]  - EVANS N D ET AL, "Glucose-dependent changes in NAD(P)H-related fluorescence lifetime of adipocytes and fibroblasts in vitro: Potential for non-invasive glucose sensing in diabetes mellitus", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY B: BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE S.A., BASEL, CH, vol. 80, no. 2, ISSN 1011-1344, (20050801), pages 122 - 129, (20050801), XP027789524 [A] 1-16 * page 124 - page 128 *
by applicantEP0293732
 US2005214891
 US2006003397
 WO9400602
 EP2022859
 US5485530
 EP0561653
 WO2007012494
 US2007026476
 US3802842
 US4061468
    - T. G. SCOTT ET AL., "Emission Properties ofNADH. Studies of Fluorescence Lifetimes...", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1970), pages 687 - 695
    - J. T. SLAMA, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 27, page 183
    - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 28, page 7688