Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800976

EP2800976 - USE OF GALECTIN-3 FOR RISK ASSESSMENT AND DETECTION OF PREECLAMPSIA AND RELATED CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.08.2015
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.09.2015  [2015/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BG Medicine, Inc.
610 N. Lincoln Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / MUNTENDAM, Pieter
642 Main Street
Boxford, MA 01921 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)EIP
EIP Europe LLP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]EIP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date13701684.607.01.2013
WO2013US20570
Priority number, dateUS201261583885P06.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261583885 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013103984
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2800976
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON GALECTIN-3 FÜR RISIKOBEWERTUNG UND NACHWEIS VON PRÄEKLAMPSIE UND VERWANDTEN LEIDEN[2014/46]
English:USE OF GALECTIN-3 FOR RISK ASSESSMENT AND DETECTION OF PREECLAMPSIA AND RELATED CONDITIONS[2014/46]
French:UTILISATION DE LA GALECTINE-3 POUR ÉVALUER LE RISQUE ET POUR LA DÉTECTION DE LA PRÉÉCLAMPSIE ET D'ÉTATS ASSOCIÉS[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase06.08.2014National basic fee paid 
06.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
24.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/39]
29.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/39]
29.04.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006166277  (KARUMANCHI S A [US] ET AL KARUMANCHI S ANANTH [US] ET AL) [X] 1,5-30,34-56 * claims 1-8, 23-25 and 32; par 37-44, 88-89, 140, 162, 182-194, 255-270; *;
 [I]  - JESCHKE ET AL, "Expression of Galectin-1, -3 (gal-1, gal-3) and the Thomsen-Friedenreich (TF) Antigen in Normal, IUGR, Preeclamptic and HELLP Placentas", PLACENTA, W.B. SAUNDERS, GB, (20071018), vol. 28, no. 11-12, doi:10.1016/J.PLACENTA.2007.06.006, ISSN 0143-4004, pages 1165 - 1173, XP022298648 [I] 1,5-30,34-56 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.placenta.2007.06.006
 [I]  - NANDOR GABOR THAN ET AL, "Galectins: guardians of eutherian pregnancy at the maternalfetal interface", TRENDS IN ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, vol. 23, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.TEM.2011.09.003, ISSN 1043-2760, (20111027), pages 23 - 31, (20110917), XP028395653 [I] 1,5-30,34-56 * figure 2, page 28, right-hand column, paragraphs 2 and 3; *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tem.2011.09.003
by applicantUS6485982
 US6319676
 US4632901
 US4816567
 US6534322
    - SCAZZOCCHIO, CURR. OPIN. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (2011), vol. 23, pages 65 - 71
    - "Role of galectin-3 in inflammation.", LIU, F.-T., Lectins and Pathology., HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (2000), page 51
    - LIU, F.-T. ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (1995), vol. 147, page 1016
    - FLOTTE, T.J. ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (1983), vol. 111, page 112
    - VAN DEN BRULE, F.A. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1994), vol. 201, page 388
    - OELLERICH, M., J. CLIN. CHEM. CLIN. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 22, pages 895 - 904
    - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103
    - KOZBOR, J., IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 133, page 3001
    - BRODEUR ET AL., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 51 - 63
    - MUNSON; POLLARD, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 107, page 220
    - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 6851
    - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381
    - MARKS ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 581
    - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, (1985), page 77
    - BOERNER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, no. 1, pages 86 - 95
    - VAN KIMMENADE ET AL., J. AM. COLL. CARDIOL., (2006), vol. 48, pages 1217 - 24
    - SHARMA ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, pages 3121 - 28
    - LOK ET AL., EUR. HEART J., (2007), vol. 28, page 141
 US20090608821