Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2807484 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2807484



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 200
31.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
29.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.04.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.04.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
01.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
27.01.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
26.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
25.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.08.2014 Annex Search / examination 6
25.08.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
25.08.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 6
25.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
06.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.05.2014 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
01.04.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.04.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.04.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
01.04.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
01.04.2014 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.04.2014 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.04.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.01.2014 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
16.12.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.11.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
28.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.11.2013 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.11.2013 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.11.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
01.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
01.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 22
06.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
06.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
06.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
15.02.2013 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 2
24.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
24.01.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
24.01.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
24.01.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 16
24.01.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3