Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2807484


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
31.03.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.05.2017  [2017/18]
24.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
22.04.2016 (Expected) grant published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
08.04.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.04.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.04.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
03.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.12.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
30.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
27.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication