Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2807484 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380006893 EP13701757



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9732368Global Dossier 15.08.2017B2
US2015031119 29.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
FR1250788 27.01.2012
WO2013EP51387 24.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6178340BGlobal Dossier 09.08.2017B2
JP2015510394 09.04.2015A
Priority number Date
FR1250788 27.01.2012
WO2013EP51387 24.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104081204BGlobal Dossier 27.03.2018B
CN104081204 01.10.2014A
Priority number Date
FR1250788 27.01.2012
WO2013EP51387 24.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2807484Global Dossier 25.05.2016B1
EP2807484 03.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
FR1250788 27.01.2012
WO2013EP51387 24.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013110734Global Dossier 01.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1250788 27.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2986237 02.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1250788 27.01.2012