Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807484

EP2807484 - DEVICE FOR EARLY DETECTION OF MICRO-ORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advencis
Parc de la Brasserie - 1
Rue Gambrinus
67190 Mutzig / FR
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / PIERQUIN, Joseph
44 Rue de Saverne
F-67120 Molsheim / FR
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[2016/21]
Former [2014/49]Rhein, Alain
CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN
17, rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Application number, filing date13701757.024.01.2013
[2016/21]
WO2013EP51387
Priority number, dateFR2012005078827.01.2012         Original published format: FR 1250788
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110734
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807484
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807484
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/50
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR FRÜHERKENNUNG VON MIKROORGANISMEN[2014/49]
English:DEVICE FOR EARLY DETECTION OF MICRO-ORGANISMS[2014/49]
French:DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ À LA DÉTECTION PRÉCOCE DE MICRO-ORGANISMES[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2014National basic fee paid 
25.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
16.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2016Fee for grant paid
01.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2015
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.01.2013
AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MK25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU24.01.2013
AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
Former [2019/39]HU24.01.2013
AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
Former [2019/31]HU24.01.2013
AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
Former [2018/46]AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
Former [2018/43]AT25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
Former [2018/13]AT25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
Former [2018/02]AT25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU24.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]WO03022999  (GENOMIC PROFILING SYSTEMS INC [US]) [I] 1-11 * page 48, line 26 - page 54, line 10; figures 3,4 *;
 [I]JP2005172680  ;
 [I]US2003155528  (TOKUDA YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0030] *;
 [A]US6002789  (OLSZTYN PAUL C [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 13 - line 45 *
 [I]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 21, Database accession no. 2006-197819, XP002684558 & JP2005172680 A 20050630 (UNITIKA LTD) [I] 1-11 * abstract *
by applicantUS2003155528
 WO03022999