Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809355

EP2809355 - CHELATING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Bruce, Fletcher
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US
02 / CARTER, Randall, Lee
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US
03 / RISHEL, Michael, James
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US
04 / DAREY, Mark, Christopher, Patrick
909 Suncrest Road
Charleston, West Virginia 25303 / US
05 / WU, Tao
464 Stonehenge Drive
Ancaster, Ontario L9K 1S7 / CA
06 / YANG, Yang
Apt 1101
10020 103 Ave NW
Edmonton, Alberta T5J 0G8 / CA
07 / VALLIANT, John, Fitzmaurice
15 Holkham Avenue
Ancaster, Ontario L9K 1N8 / CA
08 / STEPHENSON, Karin, Ann
2020 Grovetree Lane
Burlington, Ontario L7R 4VA / CA
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Aldenbäck, Ulla Christina , et al
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30
751 84 Uppsala / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Canning, Lewis R. , et al
GE Healthcare Limited
Pollards Wood
Nightingales Lane
Chalfont St Giles
Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB
Application number, filing date13701797.631.01.2013
WO2013EP51874
Priority number, dateUS20121336265831.01.2012         Original published format: US201213362658
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013113801
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2809355
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K51/04, A61K51/08, A61K103/10, C07C311/18
[2017/25]
Former International [2014/50]A61K51/04, A61K51/08, A61K103/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:CHELATBILDENDE MITTEL[2014/50]
English:CHELATING AGENTS[2014/50]
French:AGENTS DE CHÉLATION[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2018Fee for grant paid
11.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/03]
27.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/03]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004037297  (AMERSHAM PLC [GB]; BRAUERS GEORG [GB]; FARRAR GILLIAN [GB]; BARNETT DA) [X] 1,2,4-17 * page 3, lines 11-15, 21-28 * * page 15, lines 14-28 * * page 16, lines 2-8 * * page 18, line 10 - page 19, line 4 * * page 21, lines 21-23 * * page 22, line 21 - page 23, line 9 * * claims 1, 17, 19, 29 *;
 [AD]US7597875  (ARCHER COLIN MILL [GB] ET AL) [AD] 1-17 * claims 1-30 *
by applicantUS4615876
 US5688487
 WO9504552
 EP0738158
 US7597875
 US7049289
 US5997843
 EP0629617
    - S. JURISSON ET AL., INORG. CHEM., (1987), vol. 26, pages 3576 - 82
    - J-M LO ET AL., APPL. RAD. INST, (1993), vol. 44, pages 1139 - 46
    - R.PASQUALINI ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL., (199706), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 542 - 6
    - E. RUOSLAHTI, KIDNEY INT., (199705), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 1413 - 7
    - M.TONE ET AL., J.BIOCHEM, (1987), vol. 102, page 1033
    - L.HANSSON ET AL., GENE, (1994), vol. 139, page 193
    - A.GUTMAN ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1996), vol. 207, page 145
    - V.DIXIT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1986), vol. 83, page 5449
    - R.F.DOOLITTLE, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 53, page 195
    - E. C. JORGENSEN ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1979), vol. 22, no. 9, pages 1038 - 1044
    - R.K. TURKER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1972), vol. 177, page 1203
    - S. JURISSON, INORG. CHEM., (1987), vol. 26, pages 3576 - 82
    - RAMALINGAM ET AL., SYNTH. COMMUN., (1995), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 743 - 52
    - GLASER ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1996), vol. 61, no. 3, pages 1047 - 1048
    - CLAPP ET AL., J. ORG CHEM., (1971), vol. 36, no. 8, pages 1169 - 70
    - SAITO ET AL., SHIZEN KAGAKU, (1995), vol. 47, pages 41 - 9
    - SCHULZ, Z. CHEM., (1981), vol. 21, no. 11, pages 404 - 405
    - SUN ET AL., NUCL.MED.BIOL., (2010), vol. 37, pages 117 - 123
    - BARRETT ET AL., CHEM.REV., (1985), vol. 86, pages 751 - 762
    - RUZZA ET AL., ANTI-CANCER AGENTS MED.CHEM., (2012), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 416 - 427
    - LATTUADA ET AL., CHEM.SOC.REV., (2011), vol. 40, no. 5, pages 3019 - 3049
    - J.ORG.CHEM., (1971), vol. 36, no. 8, pages 1169 - 1170
    - IND J. CHEM SECT B, (1978), vol. 16B, no. IO, pages 917 - 20
    - Z. CHEM., (1981), vol. 21, no. 11, pages 404 - 5
    - J. PRACT. CHEM., (1978), vol. 320, no. 3, pages 433 - 51