Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2809333 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2809333



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1232
20.06.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.08.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.07.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.07.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.07.2017 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
06.07.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.07.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 117
06.07.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 117
06.06.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
24.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
24.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
24.04.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
24.04.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
24.04.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.04.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.12.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.12.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 117
21.12.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 117
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
07.10.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 84
07.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
07.10.2016 Description Search / examination 82
07.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
01.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
19.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
19.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
22.12.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
03.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 6
03.11.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
29.06.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.09.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
20.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
08.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
08.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
08.07.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
13.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 87
08.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
08.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 121
11.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
11.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
11.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
31.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
31.01.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
31.01.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 7
31.01.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 83
31.01.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 30
31.01.2013 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 86