Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2809333


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
22.06.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
14.07.2017 (Expected) grant published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
07.07.2017 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
07.07.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.05.2017 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.05.2017 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.05.2017 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.12.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.11.2016 Change - German title published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
11.11.2016 Change - French title published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
18.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.11.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.06.2015 First examination report
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2014 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
10.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
09.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication