Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809333

EP2809333 - DEVICE-BASED METHODS FOR LOCALISED DELIVERY OF CELL-FREE CARRIERS WITH STRESS-INDUCED CELLULAR FACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technische Universität München - Klinikum Rechts der Isar
Ismaningerstrasse 22
81675 München / DE
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHILLING, Arndt
Siebenbürgener Str. 12
81377 München / DE
02 / HADJIPANAYI, Ektoras
Hohenzollern Str. 8
80801 München / DE
03 / MACHENS, Hans-Günther
Ismaningerstr. 115
81675 München / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/33]
Former [2014/50]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13701801.631.01.2013
[2017/33]
WO2013EP51910
Priority number, dateEP2012015376903.02.2012         Original published format: EP 12153769
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113821
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809333
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809333
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/00, A61L27/00, A61K35/12
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBA08.07.2014
ME08.07.2014
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR ÖRTLICH BEGRENZTEN ABGABE VON ZELLFREIEN TRÄGERN MIT STRESSINDUZIERTEN ZELLFAKTOREN[2016/50]
English:DEVICE-BASED METHODS FOR LOCALISED DELIVERY OF CELL-FREE CARRIERS WITH STRESS-INDUCED CELLULAR FACTORS[2014/50]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET FORMULATIONS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION LOCALISÉE DE SUPPORTS SANS CELLULES AVEC FACTEURS CELLULAIRES INDUITS PAR LE STRESS[2016/50]
Former [2014/50]VORRICHTUNGSBASIERTE VERFAHREN ZUR LOKALEN FREISETZUNG ZELLFREIER TRÄGER MIT STRESSINDUZIERTEN ZELLFAKTOREN
Former [2014/50]PROCÉDÉS FONDÉS SUR UN DISPOSITIF EN VUE D'UNE ADMINISTRATION LOCALISÉE DES PORTEURS EXEMPTS DE CELLULES AVEC DES FACTEURS CELLULAIRES INDUITS PAR LE STRESS
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
29.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.04.2017Fee for grant paid
24.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.07.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
06.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2015
Opposition(s)17.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
BE31.01.2018
IE31.01.2018
LU31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
BE31.01.2018
IE31.01.2018
LU31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
BE31.01.2018
LU31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
LU31.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010210530  (NAUGHTON GAIL K [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-56 *;
 [ID]WO2009136173  (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB], et al) [ID] 1-16 * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 4 * * claim 25 *;
 [XD]  - HADJIPANAYI E ET AL, "Controlling physiological angiogenesis by hypoxia-induced signaling", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 146, no. 3, ISSN 0168-3659, (20100915), pages 309 - 317, (20100609), XP027260361 [XD] 1-16 * figure 6 *
 [XD]  - HADJIPANAYI E ET AL, First implantable device for hypoxia-mediated angiogenic induction., JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE CONTROLLED RELEASE SOCIETY 10 AUG 2011 LNKD- PUBMED:21458514, VOL. 153, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 217 - 224, (20110810), ISSN 1873-4995, XP002679092 [XD] 1-16 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JCONREL.2011.03.029
 [AD]  - CHEEMA U ET AL, "Spatially defined oxygen gradients and vascular endothelial growth factor expression in an engineered 3D cell model", CMLS CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR LIFE SCIENCES, BIRKHAUSER VERLAG, HEIDELBERG, DE, (20080101), vol. 65, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00018-007-7356-8, ISSN 1420-682X, pages 177 - 186, XP002552273 [AD] 1-16 * page 179, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00018-007-7356-8
 [ID]  - STEFANO DI SANTO ET AL, "Novel Cell-Free Strategy for Therapeutic Angiogenesis: In Vitro Generated Conditioned Medium Can Replace Progenitor Cell Transplantation", PLOS ONE, (20090101), vol. 4, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0005643, ISSN 1932-6203, pages E5643 - E5643, XP055025655 [ID] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0005643
 [XP]  - E. HADJIPANAYI ET AL, "Injectable system for spatio-temporally controlled delivery of hypoxia-induced angiogenic signalling", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (20120522), doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.04.048, ISSN 0168-3659, XP055031551 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.04.048
by applicantWO2009136173
    - HADJIPANAYI, E.; MUDERA, V.; BROWN, R. A., "Close dependence of fibroblast proliferation on collagen scaffold matrix stiffness", J.TISSUE ENG REGEN.MED., (2009), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1002/term.136, pages 77 - 84, XP055144851

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/term.136
    - BUXBOIM, A.; RAJAGOPAL, K.; BROWN, A. E.; DISCHER, D. E., "How deeply cells feel: methods for thin gels", J PHYS.CONDENS.MATTER, (2010), vol. 22, page 194116, XP020174009
    - ADAMO ML; FARRAR RP, "Resistance training, and IGF involvement in the maintenance of muscle mass during the aging process.", AGEING RES REV, (2006), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.arr.2006.05.001, pages 310 - 331, XP024959578

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.arr.2006.05.001
    - AGUIRRE JI; PLOTKIN LI; STEWART SA; WEINSTEIN RS; PARFITT AM; MANOLAGAS SC; BELLIDO T, "Osteocyte apoptosis is induced by weightlessness in mice and precedes osteoclast recruitment and bone loss.", J BONE MINER RES, (2006), vol. 21, pages 605 - 615
    - AI-MAJED AA; BRUSHART TM; GORDON T, "Electrical stimulation accelerates and increases expression of BDNF and trkB mRNA in regenerating rat femoral motoneurons.", EUR J NEUROSCI, (2000), vol. 12, pages 4381 - 4390
    - ALRASHDAN MS; PARK JC; SUNG MA; YOO SB; JAHNG JW; LEE TH; KIM SJ; LEE JH, "Thirty minutes of low intensity electrical stimulation promotes nerve regeneration after sciatic nerve crush injury in a rat model.", ACTA NEUROL BELG, (2010), vol. 110, pages 168 - 179
    - ALZGHOUL MB; GERRARD D; WATKINS BA; HANNON K, "Ectopic expression of IGF-I and Shh by skeletal muscle inhibits disuse-mediated skeletal muscle atrophy and bone osteopenia in vivo", FASEB J, (2004), vol. 18, pages 221 - 223
    - ANDROJNA C; GATICA JE; BELOVICH JM; DERWIN KA, "Oxygen diffusion through natural extracellular matrices: Implications for estimating ''Critical thickness'' values in tendon tissue engineering", TISSUE ENGINEERING PART A, (2008), vol. 14, pages 559 - 569
    - ARA J; FEKETE S; FRANK M; GOLDEN JA; PLEASURE D; VALENCIA, "Hypoxic-preconditioning induces neuroprotection against hypoxia-ischemia in newborn piglet brain", NEUROBIOL DIS, (2011), vol. 43, pages 473 - 485
    - BADYLAK SF; FREYTES DO; GILBERT TW, "Extracellular matrix as a biological scaffold material: Structure and function", ACTA BIOMATER, (2009), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.actbio.2008.09.013, pages 1 - 13, XP025804515

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actbio.2008.09.013
    - BARKEFORS I; LE JAN S; JAKOBSSON L; HEJLL E; CARLSON G; JOHANSSON H; JARVIUS J; PARK JW; JEON NL; KREUGER J, "Endothelial cell migration in stable gradients of vascular endothelial growth factor a and fibroblast growth factor 2 - Effects on chemotaxis and chemokinesis", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 283, pages 13905 - 13912
    - BHANG SH; JEON O; CHOI CY; KWON YH; KIM BS, "Controlled release of nerve growth factor from fibrin gel.", J BIOMED MATER RES A, (2007), vol. 80, pages 998 - 1002
    - BIAN L; ZHAI DY; TOUS E; RAI R; MAUCK RL; BURDICK JA, "Enhanced MSC chondrogenesis following delivery of TGF-beta3 from alginate microspheres within hyaluronic acid hydrogels in vitro and in vivo", BIOMATERIALS, (2011), vol. 32, pages 6425 - 6434
    - BONNER JF; BLESCH A; NEUHUBER B; FISCHER, "Promoting directional axon growth from neural progenitors grafted into the injured spinal cord.", J NEUROSCI RES, (2010), vol. 88, pages 1182 - 1192
    - BROWN RA; WISEMAN M; CHUO CB; CHEEMA U; NAZHAT SN, "Ultrarapid engineering of biomimetic materials and tissues: Fabrication of nano- and microstructures by plastic compression", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, (2005), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1002/adfm.200500042, pages 1762 - 1770, XP007909595

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.200500042
    - BURDICK JA; WARD M; LIANG E; YOUNG MJ; LANGER R, "Stimulation of neurite outgrowth by neurotrophins delivered from degradable hydrogels", BIOMATERIALS, (2006), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2005.06.034, pages 452 - 459, XP025097027

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2005.06.034
    - BURKE B; GIANNOUDIS A; CORKE KP; GILL D; WELLS M; ZIEGLER-HEITBROCK L; LEWIS CE, "Hypoxia-induced gene expression in human macrophages: implications for ischemic tissues and hypoxia-regulated gene therapy", AM J PATHOL, (2003), vol. 163, pages 1233 - 1243
    - CANALIS E, "Update in new anabolic therapies for osteoporosis", J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB, (2010), vol. 95, doi:doi:10.1210/jc.2009-2677, pages 1496 - 1504, XP009134364

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.2009-2677
    - CAO L; MOONEY DJ, "Spatiotemporal control over growth factor signaling for therapeutic neovascularization.", ADV DRUG DELIV REV, (2007), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2007.08.012, pages 1340 - 1350, XP022343632

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2007.08.012
    - CARMELIET P, "Mechanisms of angiogenesis and arteriogenesis", NAT MED, (2000), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/74651, pages 389 - 395, XP002464213

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/74651
    - CASSANO M; QUATTROCELLI M; CRIPPA S; PERINI I; RONZONI F; SAMPAOLESI M, "Cellular mechanisms and local progenitor activation to regulate skeletal muscle mass", J MUSCLE RES CELL MOTIL, (2009), vol. 30, pages 243 - 253, XP019792712
    - CHANG H; SHYU KG; WANG BW; KUAN P, "Regulation of hypoxia-inducible factor-1alpha by cyclical mechanical stretch in rat vascular smooth muscle cells", CLIN SCI (LOND, (2003), vol. 105, pages 447 - 456
    - CHEEMA U; CHUO CB; SARATHCHANDRA P; NAZHAT SN; BROWN RA., "Engineering functional collagen scaffolds: cyclical loading increases material strength and fibril aggregation", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, (2007), vol. 17, pages 2426 - 2431
    - CHEEMA U; BROWN R; MUDERA V; YANG SY; MCGROUTHER G; GOLDSPINK G, "Mechanical signals and IGF-I gene splicing in vitro in relation to development of skeletal muscle", J CELL PHYSIOL, (2005), vol. 202, pages 67 - 75
    - CHEEMA U; BROWN RA; ALP B; MACROBERT AJ, "Spatially defined oxygen gradients and vascular endothelial growth factor expression in an engineered 3D cell model", CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR LIFE SCIENCES, (2008), vol. 65, pages 177 - 186, XP019583865
    - CHEEMA U; HADJIPANAYI E; TAMMI N; ALP B; MUDERA V; BROWN RA, "Identification of key factors in deep 02 cell perfusion for vascular tissue engineering", INT J ARTIF ORGANS, (2009), vol. 32, pages 318 - 328
    - DAVIS-LOPEZ DE CARRIZOSA MA; MORADO-DIAZ CJ; TENA JJ; ITEZ-TEMINO B; PECERO ML; MORCUENDE SR; DE LA CRUZ RR; PASTOR AM, "Complementary actions of BDNF and neurotrophin-3 on the firing patterns and synaptic composition of motoneurons", J NEUROSCI, (2009), vol. 29, pages 575 - 587
    - DENG D; LIU W; XU F; YANG Y; ZHOU G; ZHANG WJ; CUI L; CAO Y, "Engineering human neo-tendon tissue in vitro with human dermal fibroblasts under static mechanical strain", BIOMATERIALS, (2009), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2009.08.054, pages 6724 - 6730, XP026693725

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2009.08.054
    - DI SS; YANG Z; WYLER VON BM; VOELZMANN J; DIEHM N; BAUMGARTNER I; KALKA C, "Novel cell-free strategy for therapeutic angiogenesis: in vitro generated conditioned medium can replace progenitor cell transplantation", PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, page E5643
    - DUBEY N; LETOURNEAU PC; TRANQUILLO RT, "Guided neurite elongation and schwann cell invasion into magnetically aligned collagen in simulated peripheral nerve regeneration", EXP NEUROL, (1999), vol. 158, doi:doi:10.1006/exnr.1999.7095, pages 338 - 350, XP055329090

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exnr.1999.7095
    - EGERMANN M; BALTZER AW; ADAMASZEK S; EVANS C; ROBBINS P; SCHNEIDER E; LILL CA, "Direct adenoviral transfer of bone morphogenetic protein-2 cDNA enhances fracture healing in osteoporotic sheep", HUM GENE THER, (2006), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1089/hum.2006.17.507, pages 507 - 517, XP055037664

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2006.17.507
    - EGGER M; SCHGOER W; BEER AG; JESCHKE J; LEIERER J; THEURL M; FRAUSCHER S; TEPPER OM; NIEDERWANGER A; RITSCH A, "Hypoxia up-regulates the angiogenic cytokine secretoneurin via an HIF-1alpha- and basic FGF- dependent pathway in muscle cells", FASEB J, (2007), vol. 21, pages 2906 - 2917
    - FAVIER FB; BENOIT H; FREYSSENET D, "Cellular and molecular events controlling skeletal muscle mass in response to altered use", PFLUGERS ARCH, (2008), vol. 456, pages 587 - 600, XP019630232
    - FISHER JP; JO S; MIKOS AG; REDDI AH, "Thermoreversible hydrogel scaffolds for articular cartilage engineering", J BIOMED MATER RES A, (2004), vol. 71, pages 268 - 274
    - FREEMAN JW; SILVER FH, "The effects of prestrain and collagen fibril alignment on in vitro mineralization of self-assembled collagen fibers", CONNECT TISSUE RES, (2005), vol. 46, pages 107 - 115
    - GARRETT IR, "Anabolic agents and the bone morphogenetic protein pathway", CURR TOP DEV BIOL, (2007), vol. 78, pages 127 - 171
    - GERMANI A; DI CA; MANGONI A; STRAINO S; GIACINTI C; TURRINI P; BIGLIOLI P; CAPOGROSSI MC, "Vascular endothelial growth factor modulates skeletal myoblast function.", AM J PATHOL, (2003), vol. 163, pages 1417 - 1428
    - GOLDSPINK G, "Changes in muscle mass and phenotype and the expression of autocrine and systemic growth factors by muscle in response to stretch and overload", J ANAT, (1999), vol. 194, pages 323 - 334
    - GOLDSPINK G, "Mechanical signals, IGF-I gene splicing, and muscle adaptation", PHYSIOLOGY (BETHESDA, (2005), vol. 20, pages 232 - 238
    - GORDON T, "The role of neurotrophic factors in nerve regeneration", NEUROSURG FOCUS, (2009), vol. 26, page E3
    - GORDON T, "The physiology of neural injury and regeneration: The role of neurotrophic factors.", J COMMUN DISORD, (2010), vol. 43, pages 265 - 273, XP027083903
    - GRAHAM S; LEONIDOU A; LESTER M; HELIOTIS M; MANTALARIS A; TSIRIDIS E, "Investigating the role of PDGF as a potential drug therapy in bone formation and fracture healing", EXPERT OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (2009), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1517/13543780903241607, pages 1633 - 1654, XP002656091

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543780903241607
    - GROOTHUIS A; DUDA GN; WILSON CJ; THOMPSON MS; HUNTER MR; SIMON P; BAIL HJ; VAN SCHERPENZEEL KM; KASPER G, "Mechanical stimulation of the pro-angiogenic capacity of human fracture haematoma: involvement of VEGF mechano-regulation", BONE, (2010), vol. 47, pages 438 - 444, XP027124716
    - GURKAN UA; KRUEGER A; AKKUS O, "Ossifying bone marrow explant culture as a three-dimensional mechanoresponsive in vitro model of osteogenesis", TISSUE ENG PART A, (2011), vol. 17, pages 417 - 428
    - HADJIPANAYI E; BROWN RA; MUDERA V, "Interface integration of layered collagen scaffolds with defined matrix stiffness: implications for sheet-based tissue engineering", J TISSUE ENG REGEN MED, (2009), vol. 3, pages 230 - 241
    - HADJIPANAYI E; BROWN RA; MUDERA V; DENG D; LIU W; CHEEMA U, "Controlling physiological angiogenesis by hypoxia-induced signaling", J CONTROL RELEASE, (2010), vol. 146, pages 309 - 317, XP027260361
    - HADJIPANAYI E; CHEEMA U; MUDERA V; DENG D; LIU W; BROWN RA, "First implantable device for hypoxia-mediated angiogenic induction", J CONTROL RELEASE, (2011), vol. 153, doi:doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2011.03.029, pages 217 - 224, XP002679092

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JCONREL.2011.03.029
    - HADJIPANAYI E; MUDERA V; BROWN RA, "Close dependence of fibroblast proliferation on collagen scaffold matrix stiffness", J TISSUE ENG REGEN MED, (2009), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1002/term.136, pages 77 - 84, XP055144851

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/term.136
    - HE C; KIM SW; LEE DS, "In situ gelling stimuli-sensitive block copolymer hydrogels for drug delivery", J CONTROL RELEASE, (2008), vol. 127, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2008.01.005, pages 189 - 207, XP022617735

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2008.01.005
    - HU X; YU SP; FRASER JL; LU Z; OGLE ME; WANG JA; WEI L, "Transplantation of hypoxia-preconditioned mesenchymal stem cells improves infarcted heart function via enhanced survival of implanted cells and angiogenesis", J THORAC CARDIOVASC SURG, (2008), vol. 135, pages 799 - 808, XP022549638
    - HUANG CY; HAGAR KL; FROST LE; SUN Y; CHEUNG HS, "Effects of cyclic compressive loading on chondrogenesis of rabbit bone-marrow derived mesenchymal stem cells", STEM CELLS, (2004), vol. 22, pages 313 - 323
    - HUANG J; YE Z; HU X; LU L; LUO Z, "Electrical stimulation induces calcium-dependent release of NGF from cultured Schwann cells", GLIA, (2010), vol. 58, pages 622 - 631
    - HUANG L; ZHUANG X; HU J; LANG L; ZHANG P; WANG Y; CHEN X; WEI Y; JING X, "Synthesis of biodegradable and electroactive multiblock polylactide and aniline pentamer copolymer for tissue engineering applications", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2008), vol. 9, pages 850 - 858
    - ISHII I; MIZUTA H; SEI A; HIROSE J; KUDO S; HIRAKI Y, "Healing of full-thickness defects of the articular cartilage in rabbits using fibroblast growth factor-2 and a fibrin sealant", J BONE JOINT SURG BR, (2007), vol. 89, pages 693 - 700
    - ISSACK PS; DICESARE PE, "Recent advances toward the clinical application of bone morphogenetic proteins in bone and cartilage repair", AM J ORTHOP (BELLE MEAD NJ, (2003), vol. 32, pages 429 - 436, XP009118975
    - IWANUMA O; ABE S; HIROKI E; KADO S; SAKIYAMA K; USAMI A; IDE Y, "Effects of mechanical stretching on caspase and IGF-1 expression during the proliferation process of myoblasts", ZOOLOG SCI, (2008), vol. 25, pages 242 - 247
    - JAIN A; KIM YT; MCKEON RJ; BELLAMKONDA RV, "In situ gelling hydrogels for conformal repair of spinal cord defects, and local delivery of BDNF after spinal cord injury", BIOMATERIALS, (2006), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2005.07.008, pages 497 - 504, XP025097031

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2005.07.008
    - KIDO S; KURIWAKA-KIDO R; IMAMURA T; ITO Y; INOUE D; MATSUMOTO T, "Mechanical stress induces Interleukin-11 expression to stimulate osteoblast differentiation", BONE, (2009), vol. 45, pages 1125 - 1132
    - KLOUDA L; MIKOS AG, "Thermoresponsive hydrogels in biomedical applications", EUR J PHARM BIOPHARM, (2008), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejpb.2007.02.025, pages 34 - 45, XP022370821

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2007.02.025
    - KOMATSU DE; HADJIARGYROU M, "Activation of the transcription factor HIF-1 and its target genes, VEGF, HO-1, iNOS, during fracture repair", BONE, (2004), vol. 34, pages 680 - 688
    - KOMOBUCHI H; HATO N; TERAOKA M; WAKISAKA H; TAKAHASHI H; GYO K; TABATA Y; YAMAMOTO M, "Basic fibroblast growth factor combined with biodegradable hydrogel promotes healing of facial nerve after compression injury: an experimental study", ACTA OTOLARYNGOL, (2010), vol. 130, pages 173 - 178
    - KUBO M; LI TS; KAMOTA T; OHSHIMA M; QIN SL; HAMANO K, "Increased expression of CXCR4 and integrin alphaM in hypoxia-preconditioned cells contributes to improved cell retention and angiogenic potency", J CELL PHYSIOL, (2009), vol. 220, pages 508 - 514
    - KUSHIDA A; YAMATO M; KONNO C; KIKUCHI A; SAKURAI Y; OKANO T, "Temperature- responsive culture dishes allow nonenzymatic harvest of differentiated Madin-Darby canine kidney (MDCK) cell sheets", J BIOMED MATER RES, (2000), vol. 51, pages 216 - 223
    - L'HEUREUX N; PAQUET S; LABBE R; GERMAIN L; AUGER FA, "A completely biological tissue-engineered human blood vessel", FASEB JOURNAL, (1998), vol. 12, pages 47 - 56, XP008132869
    - LEVY AP, "A cellular paradigm for the failure to increase vascular endothelial growth factor in chronically hypoxic states", CORON ARTERY DIS, (1999), vol. 10, pages 427 - 430, XP009052256
    - LI M; LIU X; LIU X; GE B, "Calcium phosphate cement with BMP-2-loaded gelatin microspheres enhances bone healing in osteoporosis: a pilot study", CLIN ORTHOP RELAT RES, (2010), vol. 468, pages 1978 - 1985
    - LI Z; YAO SJ; ALINI M; STODDART MJ, "Chondrogenesis of human bone marrow mesenchymal stem cells in fibrin-polyurethane composites is modulated by frequency and amplitude of dynamic compression and shear stress", TISSUE ENG PART A, (2010), vol. 16, pages 575 - 584
    - LOPIZ-MORALES Y; ABARRATEGI A; RAMOS V; MORENO-VICENTE C; LOPEZ-DURAN L; LOPEZ-LACOMBA JL; MARCO F, "In vivo comparison of the effects of rhBMP-2 and rhBMP-4 in osteochondral tissue regeneration", EUR CELL MATER, (2010), vol. 20, pages 367 - 378
    - LUO F; WARIARO D; LUNDBERG G; BLEGEN H; WAHLBERG E, "Vascular growth factor expression in a rat model of severe limb ischemia", J SURG RES, (2002), vol. 108, pages 258 - 267
    - LYRAS DN; KAZAKOS K; VERETTAS D; CHRONOPOULOS E; FOLARANMI S; AGROGIANNIS G, "Effect of combined administration of transforming growth factor-b1 and insulin-like growth factor I on the mechanical properties of a patellar tendon defect model in rabbits", ACTA ORTHOP BELG, (2010), vol. 76, pages 380 - 386
    - MALEMUD CJ, "Cytokines as therapeutic targets for osteoarthritis", BIODRUGS, (2004), vol. 18, pages 23 - 35
    - MANNING CN; KIM HM; SAKIYAMA-ELBERT S; GALATZ LM; HAVLIOGLU N; THOMOPOULOS S, "Sustained delivery of transforming growth factor beta three enhances tendon-to-bone healing in a rat model.", J ORTHOP RES, (2011), vol. 29, pages 1099 - 1105
    - MIERISCH CM; COHEN SB; JORDAN LC; ROBERTSON PG; BALIAN G; DIDUCH DR, "Transforming growth factor-beta in calcium alginate beads for the treatment of articular cartilage defects in the rabbit", ARTHROSCOPY, (2002), vol. 18, pages 892 - 900
    - MILKIEWICZ M; DOYLE JL; FUDALEWSKI T; ISPANOVIC E; AGHASI M; HAAS TL, "HIF-1alpha and HIF-2alpha play a central role in stretch-induced but not shear-stress-induced angiogenesis in rat skeletal muscle", J PHYSIOL, (2007), vol. 583, pages 753 - 766
    - NAMIKI A; BROGI E; KEARNEY M; KIM EA; WU TG; COUFFINHAL T; VARTICOVSKI L; ISNER JM, "Hypoxia induces vascular endothelial growth factor in cultured human endothelial cells", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 270, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.270.52.31189, pages 31189 - 31195, XP008090899

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.52.31189
    - NEIDLINGER-WILKE C; STALLA I; CLAES L; BRAND R; HOELLEN I; RUBENACKER S; ARAND M; KINZL L, "Human osteoblasts from younger normal and osteoporotic donors show differences in proliferation and TGF beta-release in response to cyclic strain", J BIOMECH, (1995), vol. 28, pages 1411 - 1418
    - NGUYEN MK; LEE DS, "Injectable biodegradable hydrogels", MACROMOL BIOSCI, (2010), vol. 10, pages 563 - 579
    - NIU X; NOURAIE M; CAMPBELL A; RANA S; MINNITI CP; SABLE C; DARBARI D; DHAM N; READING NS; PRCHAL JT, "Angiogenic and inflammatory markers of cardiopulmonary changes in children and adolescents with sickle cell disease", PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, page E7956
    - OKAZAKI KM; MALTEPE E, "Oxygen, epigenetics and stem cell fate", REGENERATIVE MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 1, pages 71 - 83
    - OZDUMAN K; OZKAN A; YILDIRIM O; PAMIR MN; GUNEL M; KILIC T, "Temporal expression of angiogenesis-related genes in developing neonatal rodent retina: a novel in vivo model to study cerebral vascular development", NEUROSURGERY, (2010), vol. 66, pages 538 - 543
    - PAJUSOLA K; KUNNAPUU J; VUORIKOSKI S; SORONEN J; ANDRE H; PEREIRA T; KORPISALO P; YLA-HERTTUALA S; POELLINGER L; ALITALO K, "Stabilized HIF-1alpha is superior to VEGF for angiogenesis in skeletal muscle via adeno-associated virus gene transfer", FASEB J, (2005), vol. 19, pages 1365 - 1367, XP002478667
    - PANG C; GAO Z; YIN J; ZHANG J; JIA W; YE J, "Macrophage infiltration into adipose tissue may promote angiogenesis for adipose tissue remodeling in obesity", AM J PHYSIOL ENDOCRINOL METAB, (2008), vol. 295, pages E313 - E322
    - PANUTSOPULOS D; ZAFIROPOULOS A; KRAMBOVITIS E; KOCHIADAKIS GE; IGOUMENIDIS NE; SPANDIDOS DA, "Peripheral monocytes from diabetic patients with coronary artery disease display increased bFGF and VEGF mRNA expression", J TRANSL MED, (2003), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1186/1479-5876-1-6, page 6, XP021009807

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1479-5876-1-6
    - PAPACHRONI KK; KARATZAS DN; PAPAVASSILIOU KA; BASDRA EK; PAPAVASSILIOU AG, "Mechanotransduction in osteoblast regulation and bone disease", TRENDS MOL MED, (2009), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molmed.2009.03.001, pages 208 - 216, XP026107645

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molmed.2009.03.001
    - PATEL MJ; CHANG KH; SYKES MC; TALISH R; RUBIN C; JO H, "Low magnitude and high frequency mechanical loading prevents decreased bone formation responses of 2T3 preosteoblasts", J CELL BIOCHEM, (2009), vol. 106, pages 306 - 316
    - PETERSEN W; VAROGA D; ZANTOP T; HASSENPFLUG J; MENTLEIN R; PUFE T, "Cyclic strain influences the expression of the vascular endothelial growth factor (VEGF) and the hypoxia inducible factor 1 alpha (HIF-1alpha) in tendon fibroblasts", J ORTHOP RES, (2004), vol. 22, pages 847 - 853
    - PLOTKIN LI; MATHOV I; AGUIRRE JI; PARFITT AM; MANOLAGAS SC; BELLIDO T, "Mechanical stimulation prevents osteocyte apoptosis: requirement of integrins, Src kinases, and ERKs", AM J PHYSIOL CELL PHYSIOL, (2005), vol. 289, pages C633 - C643
    - POTTA T; CHUN C; SONG SC, "Injectable, dual cross-linkable polyphosphazene blend hydrogels", BIOMATERIALS, (2010), vol. 31, pages 8107 - 8120, XP027259515
    - QUINN LS; ANDERSON BG; DRIVDAHL RH; ALVAREZ B; ARGILES JM, "Overexpression of interleukin-15 induces skeletal muscle hypertrophy in vitro: implications for treatment of muscle wasting disorders", EXP CELL RES, (2002), vol. 280, pages 55 - 63
    - RADISIC M; MALDA J; EPPING E; GENG W; LANGER R; VUNJAK-NOVAKOVIC G, "Oxygen gradients correlate with cell density and cell viability in engineered cardiac tissue", BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2006), vol. 93, pages 332 - 343
    - RAGHUNATH M; WONG YS; FAROOQ M; GE R, "Pharmacologically induced angiogenesis in transgenic zebrafish.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (2009), vol. 378, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2008.11.127, pages 766 - 771, XP025841493

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2008.11.127
    - RATH B; NAM J; KNOBLOCH TJ; LANNUTTI JJ; AGARWAL S, "Compressive forces induce osteogenic gene expression in calvarial osteoblasts", J BIOMECH, (2008), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jbiomech.2007.11.024, pages 1095 - 1103, XP022518925

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiomech.2007.11.024
    - RAY PS; ESTRADA-HERNANDEZ T; SASAKI H; ZHU L; MAULIK N, "Early effects of hypoxia/reoxygenation on VEGF, ang-1, ang-2 and their receptors in the rat myocardium: implications for myocardial angiogenesis", MOL CELL BIOCHEM, (2000), vol. 213, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1007180518474, pages 145 - 153, XP008126003

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1007180518474
    - ROSENSTEIN JM; KRUM JM; RUHRBERG C, "VEGF in the nervous system", ORGANOGENESIS, (2010), vol. 6, pages 107 - 114
    - RUBIN C; XU G; JUDEX S, "The anabolic activity of bone tissue, suppressed by disuse, is normalized by brief exposure to extremely low-magnitude mechanical stimuli", FASEB J, (2001), vol. 15, pages 2225 - 2229
    - SEIL JT; WEBSTER TJ, "Electrically active nanomaterials as improved neural tissue regeneration scaffolds", WILEY INTERDISCIP REV NANOMED NANOBIOTECHNOL, (2010), vol. 2, pages 635 - 647
    - SEMENZA GL, "Regulation of tissue perfusion in mammals by hypoxia-inducible factor 1.", EXP PHYSIOL, (2007), vol. 92, pages 988 - 991
    - SILVA EA; MOONEY DJ, "Spatiotemporal control of vascular endothelial growth factor delivery from injectable hydrogels enhances angiogenesis", J THROMB HAEMOST, (2007), vol. 5, pages 590 - 598
    - SIMIC P; CULEJ JB; ORLIC I; GRGUREVIC L; DRACA N; SPAVENTI R; VUKICEVIC S, "Systemically administered bone morphogenetic protein-6 restores bone in aged ovariectomized rats by increasing bone formation and suppressing bone resorption", J BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, pages 25509 - 25521
    - SKUTEK M; VAN GM; ZEICHEN J; BRAUER N; BOSCH U, "Cyclic mechanical stretching modulates secretion pattern of growth factors in human tendon fibroblasts", EUR J APPL PHYSIOL, (2001), vol. 86, pages 48 - 52
    - SMITH LA; LIU X; MA PX, "Tissue Engineering with Nano-Fibrous Scaffolds", SOFT MATTER, (2008), vol. 4, pages 2144 - 2149
    - TAGAMI Y; KURIMOTO T; MIYOSHI T; MORIMOTO T; SAWAI H; MIMURA O, "Axonal regeneration induced by repetitive electrical stimulation of crushed optic nerve in adult rats", JPN J OPHTHALMOL, (2009), vol. 53, pages 257 - 266, XP019667534
    - TAKEUCHI Y; WATANABE S; ISHII G; TAKEDA S; NAKAYAMA K; FUKUMOTO S; KANETA Y; INOUE D; MATSUMOTO T; HARIGAYA K, "Interleukin-11 as a stimulatory factor for bone formation prevents bone loss with advancing age in mice", J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M207804200, pages 49011 - 49018, XP002290581

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M207804200
    - TAYLOR SJ; MCDONALD JW, III; SAKIYAMA-ELBERT SE, "Controlled release of neurotrophin-3 from fibrin gels for spinal cord injury", J CONTROL RELEASE, (2004), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2004.05.003, pages 281 - 294, XP004521717

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2004.05.003
    - THOMOPOULOS S; DAS R; SAKIYAMA-ELBERT S; SILVA MJ; CHARLTON N; GELBERMAN RH, "bFGF and PDGF-BB for tendon repair: controlled release and biologic activity by tendon fibroblasts in vitro", ANN BIOMED ENG, (2010), vol. 38, pages 225 - 234, XP019765906
    - TIDBALL JG, "Mechanical signal transduction in skeletal muscle growth and adaptation", J APPL PHYSIOL, (2005), vol. 98, pages 1900 - 1908
    - TOMANEK RJ; ZHENG W; YUE X, "Growth factor activation in myocardial vascularization: therapeutic implications", MOL CELL BIOCHEM, (2004), vol. 264, pages 3 - 11
    - TORRY RJ; TOMANEK RJ; ZHENG W; MILLER SJ; LABARRERE CA; TORRY DS, "Hypoxia increases placenta growth factor expression in human myocardium and cultured neonatal rat cardiomyocytes", J HEART LUNG TRANSPLANT, (2009), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1016/j.healun.2008.11.917, pages 183 - 190, XP025913378

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.healun.2008.11.917
    - UGGEN C; DINES J; MCGARRY M; GRANDE D; LEE T; LIMPISVASTI O, "The effect of recombinant human platelet-derived growth factor BB-coated sutures on rotator cuff healing in a sheep model", ARTHROSCOPY, (2010), vol. 26, doi:doi:10.1016/j.arthro.2010.02.025, pages 1456 - 1462, XP027422332

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.arthro.2010.02.025
    - WAN L; XIA R; DING W, "Short-term low-frequency electrical stimulation enhanced remyelination of injured peripheral nerves by inducing the promyelination effect of brain-derived neurotrophic factor on Schwann cell polarization", J NEUROSCI RES, (2010), vol. 88, pages 2578 - 2587
    - WANG Y; WAN C; GILBERT SR; CLEMENS TL, "Oxygen sensing and osteogenesis", ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (2007), vol. 1117, pages 1 - 11
    - WENJIN W; WENCHAO L; HAO Z; FENG L; YAN W; WODONG S; XIANQUN F; WENLONG D, "Electrical stimulation promotes BDNF expression in spinal cord neurons through Ca(2+)-and Erk-dependent signaling pathways", CELL MOL NEUROBIOL, (2011), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.1007/s10571-010-9639-0, pages 459 - 467, XP019891522

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10571-010-9639-0
    - WU G; JU L; JIN T; CHEN L; SHAO L; WANG Y; LIU B, "Local delivery of recombinant human bone morphogenetic protein-2 increases axonal regeneration and the expression of tau protein after facial nerve injury", J INT MED RES, (2010), vol. 38, pages 1682 - 1688
    - YANG G; CRAWFORD RC; WANG JH, "Proliferation and collagen production of human patellar tendon fibroblasts in response to cyclic uniaxial stretching in serum-free conditions", J BIOMECH, (2004), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jbiomech.2004.01.005, pages 1543 - 1550, XP004678046

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiomech.2004.01.005
    - ZDANOWICZ MM; TEICHBERG S, "Effects of insulin-like growth factor-1/binding protein-3 complex on muscle atrophy in rats", EXP BIOL MED (MAYWOOD, (2003), vol. 228, pages 891 - 897