EP2801216 - CONTROL OF ON-DEMAND SERVICES COMMUNICATED IN BROADCAST MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoist Locatel France Immeuble Axe Seine 1 rue du 1er Mai F-92000 Nanterre / FR | [2014/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRANNOY, Antoine 49 rue de l'Est F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
MARTY, Hugues 3 rue Paul Escudier F-75009 Paris / FR | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13701831.3 | 04.01.2013 | WO2013FR50023 | Priority number, date | FR20120050121 | 05.01.2012 Original published format: FR 1250121 | [2014/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013102745 | Date: | 11.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2801216 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/472, H04N21/214, H04N21/434, H04N21/236 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
H04N21/472 (EP);
H04N21/2143 (EP);
H04N21/23608 (EP);
H04N21/4344 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG VON IM RUNDFUNKMODUS ÜBERMITTELTEN ON-DEMAND-DIENSTEN | [2014/46] | English: | CONTROL OF ON-DEMAND SERVICES COMMUNICATED IN BROADCAST MODE | [2014/46] | French: | CONTROLE DE SERVICES A LA DEMANDE COMMUNIQUES EN MODE DE DIFFUSION | [2014/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 06.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5625864 (BUDOW HARRY S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 20 - line 30 * * figure 2 *; | [YA]EP1865660 (ALTICAST CORP [KR]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] *[A] 8,10-13; | [IY]WO2010133747 (MONTANE FOLCH JOAN [ES], et al) [I] 1,2,5-15 * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 4, line 1 - line 8 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0052] * [Y] 3,4 |