Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802756

EP2802756 - ELECTRICITY GENERATION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.04.2019
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Highview Enterprises Limited
Suite A
6 Honduras Street
London EC1Y 0TH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/11]For all designated states
Highview Enterprises Limited
Suite A
6 Honduras Street
London, EC1Y 0TH / GB
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Highview Enterprises Limited
1 Finsbury Circus
London EC2M 7SH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HARRIS, John Daniel Alastair
6 Christ Church Road
Surbiton Surrey KT5 8JJ / GB
02 / MORGAN, Robert
42 Hawkins Road
Shoreham by Sea West Sussex BN43 6TH / GB
03 / BRETT, Stephen Gareth
Oakview House
Loddon Court Farm
Beech Hill Road
Spencer's Wood Reading RG7 1HT / GB
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13701867.710.01.2013
WO2013GB50037
Priority number, dateGB2012000054813.01.2012         Original published format: GB 201200548
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013104904
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802756
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:F02C1/05, F02C1/08, F02C6/14
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:STROMERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN[2014/47]
English:ELECTRICITY GENERATION DEVICE AND METHOD[2014/47]
French:DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
05.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]US3998059  (RANDELL JOHN EDWARD) [Y] 1-17 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 68; figure 3 *;
 [Y]WO2007028221  (DA COSTA REYNALDO SIGILIAO [BR]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7047744  (ROBERTSON STUART J [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,12,14,17 * columns 4,5,6; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]  - NAJJAR Y S H ET AL, "Cryogenic power conversion with regasification of LNG in a gas turbine plant", ENERGY CONVERSION AND MANAGEMENT, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 34, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0196-8904(93)90111-M, ISSN 0196-8904, (19930401), pages 273 - 280, (19930401), XP025412993 [A] 1,2,12,17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0196-8904(93)90111-M