Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814716

EP2814716 - RAIL WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Str. 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / HÖGER, Bernhard
Schülestraße 61
89522 Heidenheim / DE
02 / LUQUE ALEMAN, Enrique
Bemmelberger Gasse
89601 Schelklingen / DE
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13701976.623.01.2013
[2019/36]
WO2013EP51194
Priority number, dateDE2012100271614.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012002716
[2014/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120672
Date:22.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814716
Date:24.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814716
Date:04.09.2019
Language:DE
[2019/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B61F3/16
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHIENENRAD[2014/52]
English:RAIL WHEEL[2014/52]
French:ROUE FERROVIAIRE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2014National basic fee paid 
19.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
30.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.06.2019Fee for grant paid
17.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.07.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
25.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0567445  (SGP VERKEHRSTECHNIK [AT]) [Y] 1-5,7-10 * the whole document *;
 [YD]EP0943519  (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-5,7-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0698540  (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19945464  (CKD DOPRAVNI SYSTEMY A S [CZ]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2222603  (BURROWS ROBERT J, et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0911239  (GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantDE3736445
 DE8408914U
 EP0943519