Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807352

EP2807352 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CATALYTIC CONVERTER FLOW BODY, AND CATALYTIC CONVERTER FLOW BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hug Engineering AG
Im Geren 14
8352 Elsau / CH
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / HUG, Christoph
Brunnenwiesstrasse 39
CH-8542 Wiesendangen / CH
02 / HUG, Hans Thomas
Grabenwiese 87
CH-8484 Weisslingen / CH
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[2017/43]
Former [2014/49]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13702010.325.01.2013
[2017/43]
WO2013EP51402
Priority number, dateDE20121010068727.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012100687
DE20121010869817.09.2012         Original published format: DE102012108698
[2014/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110743
Date:01.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807352
Date:03.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807352
Date:25.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/28, F01N3/022
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES KATALYSATOR-STRÖMUNGSKÖRPERS UND KATALYSATOR-STRÖMUNGSKÖRPER[2014/49]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CATALYTIC CONVERTER FLOW BODY, AND CATALYTIC CONVERTER FLOW BODY[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS D'ÉCOULEMENT DE CATALYSEUR ET CORPS D'ÉCOULEMENT DE CATALYSEUR[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2014National basic fee paid 
21.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
23.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2017Fee for grant paid
06.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17164600.3  / EP3219695
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2016
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
AT25.01.2018
BG25.01.2018
GB25.01.2018
IE25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/23]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
AT25.01.2018
BG25.01.2018
GB25.01.2018
IE25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2019/09]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
GB25.01.2018
IE25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/52]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
GB25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/50]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
GB25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/47]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
LU25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/43]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE202004018812U  (SWARS HELMUT [DE]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0040]; figures 3,15,20,24c * * paragraph [0085] * [I] 24-27;
 [XI]WO03069138  (VOLVO TEKNISK UTVECKLING AB [SE], et al) [X] 15 * figures 1-11 * [I] 24-27;
 [XI]EP0325111  (LEISTRITZ AG [DE]) [X] 15 * figure 3 * [I] 24-27;
 [XI]EP0744536  (SILENTOR AS [DK]) [X] 15 * figures 6-8 * [I] 24-27;
 [XI]WO9621093  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 15 * figure 1A * [I] 24-27;
 [A]US6190624  (ROMATIER JACQUES J L [US]) [A] 1-27 * figures 1,16 *