Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810457

EP2810457 - RADIO MODULE, APPLICATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN APPLICATION DEVICE THAT EXCHANGES APPLICATION DATA VIA A CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gemalto M2M GmbH
Werinherstraße 81
81541 Munich / DE
[2017/06]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Gemalto M2M GmbH
St.-Martin-Straße 60
81541 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHULTZ, Michael
Brehmestr. 15
13187 Berlin / DE
02 / DENZIN, Florian
Mehringdamm 80
10965 Berlin / DE
03 / BREUER, Volker
Schwalbenring 20
16727 Bötzow / DE
04 / WESTERKOWSKY, Frank
Treuchtlinger Str. 4
10779 Berlin / DE
05 / ROOK, Jörg
Goethestr. 13
12305 Berlin / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Grevin, Emmanuel , et al
Thales Dis France SA
Intellectual Property Department
525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne
CS12023
13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Grevin, Emmanuel , et al
Gemalto SA
525 avenue du Pic de Bertagne
CS 12023
13881 Gemenos Cedex / FR
Former [2014/50]Grevin, Emmanuel
Gemalto SA
Avenue du Jujubier
ZI Athélia IV
13705 La Ciotat / FR
Application number, filing date13702073.104.02.2013
[2019/16]
WO2013EP52149
Priority number, dateEP2012015394003.02.2012         Original published format: EP 12153940
EP2012015696224.02.2012         Original published format: EP 12156962
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113925
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810457
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810457
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/70, H04W4/08, H04W4/50
[2018/45]
Former International [2014/50]H04W4/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUNKMODUL, ANWENDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER ANWENDUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSTAUSCH VON ANWENDUNGSDATEN ÜBER EIN ZELLULARES FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK[2018/45]
English:RADIO MODULE, APPLICATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN APPLICATION DEVICE THAT EXCHANGES APPLICATION DATA VIA A CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2014/50]
French:MODULE RADIO, DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION QUI ÉCHANGE DES DONNÉES D'APPLICATION PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION RADIO CELLULAIRE[2018/45]
Former [2014/50]FUNKMODUL, ANWENDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER ANWENDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN AUSTAUSCH VON ANWENDUNGSDATEN ÜBER EIN MOBILFUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ
Former [2014/50]MODULE RADIO, DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLOITATION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION ÉCHANGEANT DES DONNÉES D'APPLICATION PAR LE BIAIS D'UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION PAR RADIO CELLULAIRE
Entry into regional phase03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
09.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2019Fee for grant paid
06.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL17.04.2019
[2019/44]
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011274040  (PANI DIANA [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0172] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2011199905  (AGHILI B; ANEPU B M; DIGIROLAMO R; GAUVREAU J; MURRAY J; PANI D; PINHE) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0216] * * figures 1-10 *;
 [X]EP2400734  (KONINKL KPN NV [NL]; TNO [NL]) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]WO2011087826  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]; SHAHEEN KAMEL M [US]; PURKAYASTHA D) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0133] * * figures 1-9B *;
 [X]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Service requirements for Machine-Type Communications (MTC); Stage 1 (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 22.368, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110930), vol. SA WG1, no. V11.3.0, pages 1 - 24, XP050554259 [X] 1-24 * section 3 - section 7 *
 [X]  - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System Improvements for Machine-Type Communications; (Release 11)", 3GPP DRAFT; 23888-160-RM, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111202), XP050575133 [X] 1-24 * abstract *