blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2811846

EP2811846 - ACIDIC AQUEOUS PRODUCT COMPRISING OIL-CONTAINING MICROCAPSULES AND METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  17.12.2021
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2021Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 19.01.2022  [2022/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pepsico, Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, NY 10577 / US
[2022/03]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Pepsico, Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, NY 10577 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GIVEN, JR., Peter, S.
16 O'Neill Court
Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US
02 / TROMP, Robert, Hans
Zevenwouden 151
3524 Utrecht CN / NL
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Maiwald GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2022/03]Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2016/48]Duxbury, Stephen, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bavariaring 17
80336 München / DE
Former [2014/51]Duxbury, Stephen, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Pettenkoferstrasse 37
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13702184.622.01.2013
[2016/48]
WO2013US22550
Priority number, dateUS20121336854208.02.2012         Original published format: US201213368542
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013119384
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811846
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811846
Date:30.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/48]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2811846
Date:19.01.2022
Language:EN
[2022/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationIPC:A23L33/17, A23L2/54, A23L2/68, A61K9/50, A23P10/30, A23L29/231, A23L33/12
[2019/04]
CPC:
A61K9/5052 (EP,US); A23L2/54 (EP,CN,US); A23L2/68 (EP,CN,US);
A23L29/231 (EP,CN,US); A23L33/12 (EP,CN,US); A23L33/17 (EP,CN,US);
A23P10/30 (EP,CN,US); A61K9/5036 (EP,US); A23V2002/00 (EP,CN,US) (-)
C-Set:
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/224, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/5072, A23V2250/50722, A23V2250/54, A23V2300/08 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/50722, A23V2200/224, A23V2250/54, A23V2250/5072, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/54252, A23V2300/08 (CN)
Former IPC [2016/18]A23L33/17
Former IPC [2014/51]A23L1/305, A23P1/04, A23L1/00, A23L1/0524, A61K9/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:SAURES WÄSSRIGES PRODUKT MIT ÖLHALTIGEN MIKROKAPSELN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2014/51]
English:ACIDIC AQUEOUS PRODUCT COMPRISING OIL-CONTAINING MICROCAPSULES AND METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE THEREOF[2014/51]
French:PRODUIT AQUEUX ACIDE COMPRENANT DES MICROCAPSULES CONTENANT DE L'HUILE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2014National basic fee paid 
18.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2016Fee for grant paid
25.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.08.2017    ADMISSIBLE
Arla Foods amba
Sønderhøj 14
8260 Viby J / DK
Opponent's representative
Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
 [2017/40]
09.10.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.02.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.12.2018Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.03.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.05.2021Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.09.2021Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.12.2021Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition13.05.2019Appeal received No.  T1395/19
23.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
26.05.2021Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
05.08.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
26.05.2021Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.01.2013
AL30.11.2016
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CY30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
MK30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
IS30.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
[2020/33]
Former [2019/51]HU22.01.2013
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CY30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
MK30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2019/47]HU22.01.2013
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CY30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU22.01.2013
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/51]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
LU22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV30.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]CN1098874  (ZHAO YOULING [CN]) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0797925  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN1345588  (STATE RES CT OF MARINE PHARMAC [CN]) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007120500  (OCEAN NUTRITION CANADA LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-36* the whole document *;
 [XI]US2009004333  (NAKHASI DILIP K [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7 * claims 1, 2, 8, 13, 26-28 * [I] 2,5,6,8-36;
 [A]WO2009080702  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *;
 [XI]EP2292102  (LIPOFOODS S L [ES]) [X] 1,4 * example 3; claims 1-3 * [I] 2,3,5-36;
 [I]  - Stephen Daniells, "Pectin-protein combo may extend ingredient microencapsulation", (20100624), Food navigator.com, URL: http://www.foodnavigator.com/Science-Nutrition/Pectin-protein-combo-may-extend-ingredient-microencapsulation, (20130516), XP002697207 [I] 1-36 * the whole document *
OppositionWO2005048998
 WO2007034213
 WO2008085997
 US2009004333
 US2009061048
 WO2009070010
    - KRIS-ETHERTON et al., "Fish Consumption, Fish Oil, Omega-3 Fatty Acids, and Cardiovascular Disease; Cir- culation", Circulation, (20020000), vol. 106, pages 2747 - 2757, XP003002635

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000038493.65177.94
    - G. Houen, "The Solubility of proteins in Organic Solvents", Acta Chemica Scandinavia, (19960000), vol. 50, pages 68 - 70, XP055525367
    - C. SANCHEZ, "Thermal aggregation of Whey Protein Isolate Containing Microparticulated or Hydrolyzed Whey Proteins", J. Agric. Food Chem., (19970000), vol. 45, pages 2384 - 2392, XP055312506

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf970061p
    - PILAR PUYOL, "Thermal gelation of commercial whey protein concentrate: influence of pH 4.6 insoluble protein on thermal aggregation", International Journal of Dairy Technology, (19990803), vol. 52, pages 81 - 91, XP055371130

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-0307.1999.tb02078.x
    - Walstra Pieter, Et Al., "Protein Preparations", Handbook of Dairy Science and Technology, (20060000), pages 537 - 538, XP055525374
    - MONTENEGRO et al., "Products and Applications of Biopol- ymers", Gum Arabic: More Than an Edible Emulsifier, (20120300), ISBN 978-953-51-0226-7, XP055515456
    - EUSTON et al., "Kinetics of droplet aggregation in heated whey protein-stabilized emulsions: effect of polysaccharides", Food Hydrocolloids, (20020000), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 499 - 505, XP027303976
    - SANTIPANICHWONG et al., "Core shell biopolymer nanoparticles produced by electrostatic deposition of beet pectin onto heat denatured beta-lactoglobulin aggregates", Journal of Food Science, (20080000), vol. 73, no. 6, pages 23 - 30, XP055415947
    - YE et al., "Complexation between milk proteins and polysaccharides via electrostatic interaction: principles and applications - a review", International Journal of Food Science and Technology, (20080000), vol. 43, pages 406 - 415, XP055415950
    - GUZEY et al., "Formation, stability and properties of multilayer emulsions for application in the food industry", Advances in Colloid and Interface Science, (20060000), vol. 128-130, pages 227 - 248, XP027908829
    - ONWULATA et al., Whey processing, functionality and health benefits, (20080000), ISBN 978-0-8138-0903-8, pages 63 - 64, XP055371122
    - ONWULATA et al., Whey processing, functionality and health benefits, (20080000), ISBN 978-0-8138-0903-8, pages 63,64,76,77,78 - 80,90-93-114,115
    - KRIS-ETHERTON et al., "Fish Consumption, Fish Oil, Omega-3 Fatty Acids, and Cardiovascular Disease; Cir- culation", Circulation, (20020000), vol. 106, pages 2747 - 2757
    - G. Houen, "The Solubility of proteins in Organic Solvents", Acta Chemica Scandinavia, (19960000), vol. 50, pages 68 - 70
    - C. SANCHEZ, "Thermal aggregation of Whey Protein Isolate Containing Microparticulated or Hydrolyzed Whey Proteins", J. Agric. Food Chem., (19970000), vol. 45, pages 2384 - 2392
    - PILAR PUYOL, "Thermal gelation of commercial whey protein concentrate: influence of pH 4.6 insoluble protein on thermal aggregation", International Journal of Dairy Technology, (19990803), vol. 52, pages 81 - 91
    - Walstra Pieter, Et Al., "Protein Preparations", Handbook of Dairy Science and Technology, (20060000), pages 537 - 538
    - MONTENEGRO et al., "Products and Applications of Biopol- ymers", Gum Arabic: More Than an Edible Emulsifier, (20120300), ISBN 978-953-51-0226-7
    - EUSTON et al., "Kinetics of droplet aggregation in heated whey protein-stabilized emulsions: effect of polysaccharides", Food Hydrocolloids, (20020000), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 499 - 505
    - SANTIPANICHWONG et al., "Core shell biopolymer nanoparticles produced by electrostatic deposition of beet pectin onto heat denatured beta-lactoglobulin aggregates", Journal of Food Science, (20080000), vol. 73, no. 6, pages 23 - 30
    - YE et al., "Complexation between milk proteins and polysaccharides via electrostatic interaction: principles and applications - a review", International Journal of Food Science and Technology, (20080000), vol. 43, pages 406 - 415
    - GUZEY et al., "Formation, stability and properties of multilayer emulsions for application in the food industry", Advances in Colloid and Interface Science, (20060000), vol. 128-130, pages 227 - 248
    - ONWULATA et al., Whey processing, functionality and health benefits, (20080000), ISBN 978-0-8138-0903-8, pages 63 - 64
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.