Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810442

EP2810442 - IMPLICIT DERIVATION OF PARALLEL MOTION ESTIMATION RANGE SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / SEREGIN, Vadim
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / WANG, Xianglin
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / CHEN, Jianle
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / KARCZEWICZ, Marta
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Loveless, Ian Mark
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Klang, Alexander H.
Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13702185.322.01.2013
WO2013US22557
Priority number, dateUS201261593169P31.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261593169 P
US20131374614821.01.2013         Original published format: US201313746148
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116043
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810442
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/36, H04N7/26
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:IMPLIZITE ABLEITUNG DER PARALLELEN BEWEGUNGSSCHÄTZUNGSBEREICHSGRÖSSE[2014/50]
English:IMPLICIT DERIVATION OF PARALLEL MOTION ESTIMATION RANGE SIZE[2014/50]
French:DÉRIVATION IMPLICITE DE DIMENSION DE PLAGE D'ESTIMATION DE MOUVEMENT PARALLÈLE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2014National basic fee paid 
29.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
26.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201907   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AP]US2012257678  (ZHOU MINHUA [US], et al) [AP] 1-52 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - ZHOU (TI) M, "Parallelized merge/skip mode for HEVC", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110722), no. JCTVC-F069, XP030009092 [Y] 1-52 * abstract * * pages 1-6, sections 1-3 *
 [Y]  - KIM (ETRI) H Y ET AL, "CU-based Merge Candidate List Construction", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111108), no. JCTVC-G416, XP030110400 [Y] 1-52 * abstract * * pages 1-4, sections 1-3 *
 [A]  - KIM (ETRI) H Y ET AL, "Non-CE9: Throughput improvement for merge/skip mode", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120120), no. JCTVC-H0240, XP030111267 [A] 1-52 * abstract * * pages 1-4, sections 1-2 *
 [A]  - JEON Y ET AL, "AHG10: Unified design on parallel merge/skip", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120130), no. JCTVC-H0090, XP030111117 [A] 1-52 * abstract * * pages 2-3, sections 1-2 *
 [A]  - JEON Y ET AL, "Non-CE9: Removing PU dependency in TMVP reference index derivation", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120120), no. JCTVC-H0092, XP030111119 [A] 1-52 * abstract * * pages 1-2, sections 1-2 *
 [A]  - KIM (ETRI) H Y ET AL, "AHG10: Unified design on parallel merge/skip with reduced candidates", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120129), no. JCTVC-H0247, XP030111274 [A] 1-52 * abstract * * pages 1-3, sections 1-2 *
by applicant   - "High efficiency video coding (HEVC) text specification draft 9", BROSS ET AL., JCTVC-11003