Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809353

EP2809353 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A POLYMERIC CARRIER CARGO COMPLEX AND AT LEAST ONE PROTEIN OR PEPTIDE ANTIGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CureVac AG
Paul-Ehrlich-Str. 15
72076 Tübingen / DE
[2015/47]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Curevac GmbH
Paul-Ehrlich-Str. 15
72076 Tübingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BAUMHOF, Patrick
Erlenstrasse 28
72144 Dusslingen / DE
02 / KRAMPS, Thomas
Lange Gasse 44
72070 Tübingen / DE
03 / VOSS, Söhnke
Savoyer Weg 12
69151 Neckargemünd / DE
04 / KALLEN, Karl-Josef
Marienhofer Weg 24
50226 Königsdorf / DE
05 / FOTIN-MLECZEK, Mariola
Chemnitzer Weg 10
71065 Sindelfingen / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Graf von Stosch, Andreas , et al
Graf von Stosch
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Prinzregentenstraße 22
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Graf von Stosch, Andreas , et al
Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13702189.531.01.2013
WO2013EP00291
Priority number, dateWO2012EP0042031.01.2012         Original published format: PCT/EP2012/000420
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113501
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809353
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/64, A61K39/39, A61K39/00, A61K39/12, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P31/00
[2019/26]
Former International [2014/50]A61K47/48, A61K39/39, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P31/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBA22.05.2014
ME22.05.2014
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM POLYMERTRÄGER-FRACHTKOMPLEX UND MINDESTENS EINEM PROTEIN- ODER PEPTIDANTIGEN[2014/50]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A POLYMERIC CARRIER CARGO COMPLEX AND AT LEAST ONE PROTEIN OR PEPTIDE ANTIGEN[2014/50]
French:COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UN COMPLEXE CARGO-SUPPORT POLYMÈRE ET AU MOINS UN ANTIGÈNE PROTÉINIQUE OU PEPTIDIQUE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2014National basic fee paid 
22.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
09.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2011053829  (BAUMHOF PATRICK [DE], et al) [Y] 12,13 * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0364] - paragraph [0422] *;
 [XP]WO2012013326  (CUREVAC GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1-22 * page 112, line 1 - page 118, line 5 *;
 [XP]WO2012113413  (CUREVAC GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1-22 * page 10, line 1 - line 10 * * page 46, line 21 - line 24 * * page 121, line 1 - page 129, line 14 *
 [XYI]  - MICHAEL J HEFFERNAN ET AL, "Disulfide-Crosslinked Polyion Micelles for Delivery of Protein Therapeutics", ANNALS OF BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20090610), vol. 37, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S10439-009-9734-X, ISSN 1573-9686, pages 1993 - 2002, XP019727009 [X] 1,8,9,11,15-18,20,21 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1998, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 1999, column 1, paragraph 1 * [Y] 12,13 [I] 2-7,10,14,19,22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10439-009-9734-x
by applicantWO2009030481
 US6770740
 WO2010003193
 WO03086280
    - GUY, B., NAT REV MICROBIOL, (2007), vol. 5, no. 7, pages 505 - 17
    - O'HAGAN, D. T.; E. DE GREGORIO, DRUG DISCOV TODAY, (2009), vol. 14, no. 11-12, pages 541 - 51
    - MEYLAN, E.; J. TSCHOPP, NATURE, (2006), vol. 442, no. 7098, pages 39 - 44
    - FOERG, C.; MERKLE, H.P., J PHARM SCI, (2008), vol. 97, pages 144 - 62
    - GAO, X.; KIM, K.; LIU, D., AAPSJ, (2007), vol. 9, pages E92 - 104
    - GAO, X.; KIM, K.; LIU, D., MPSJ, (2007), vol. 9, pages E92 - 104
    - READ, M.L. ET AL., J GENE MED., (2003), vol. 5, pages 232 - 245
    - READ, M.L. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2005), vol. 33, page E86
    - MCKENZIE, D. L.; K. Y. KWOK ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, no. 14, pages 9970 - 7
    - MCKENZIE, D. L.; E. SMILEY ET AL., BIOCONJUG CHEM, (2000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 901 - 9
    - COLLARD, W. T.; EVERS, D. L.; MCKENZIE, D. L; D RICE, K. G., CARBOHYDR. RES., (2000), vol. 323, pages 176 - 184
    - AKASHI, CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEV., (2001), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 660 - 666
    - HOLCIK, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 2410 - 2414
    - LAI ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (1995), vol. 121, pages 2349 - 2360
    - KARLIN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877
    - ALTSCHUL, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - ZAMORE, NAT. STRUCT. BIOL., (2001), vol. 9, pages 746 - 750
    - SHARP, GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 5, pages 485 - 490
    - HANNON, NATURE, (2002), vol. 41, pages 244 - 251
    - STARK ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 67, pages 227 - 264
    - HE; KATZE, VIRAL LMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 15, pages 95 - 119
    - ELBASHIR, NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498
    - HEMMI H ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, pages 740 - 5
    - BAUER S ET AL., PROC NATLACADSCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 9237 - 42
    - MEYLAN, E.; TSCHOPP, J., "Toll-like receptors and RNA helicases: two parallel ways to trigger antiviral responses.", MOL. CELL, (2006), vol. 22, pages 561 - 569
    - CLIQUET F.; AUBERT M.; SAGNE L., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1998), vol. 212, pages 79 - 87