Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802282

EP2802282 - ELECTROPHYSIOLOGY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2016  [2016/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / KOBLISH, Josef V.
1568 Partridge Court
Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US
02 / KIM, Isaac J.
3268 Montecito Drive
San Jose, California 95135 / US
03 / CHEUNG, Desmond
1550 Technology Drive
Unit 1002
San Jose, California 95110 / US
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimstaler Strasse 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13702283.610.01.2013
WO2013US21013
Priority number, dateUS201261585083P10.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261585083 P
US201261715032P17.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261715032 P
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013106557
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802282
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61B18/14, A61B5/042, // A61B5/0464, A61B5/06, A61B18/00
[2015/23]
Former International [2014/47]A61B18/14, A61B5/042, A61B18/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGIESYSTEM[2014/47]
English:ELECTROPHYSIOLOGY SYSTEM[2014/47]
French:SYSTÈME D'ÉLECTROPHYSIOLOGIE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
05.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/14]
18.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/14]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2008243214  (KOBLISH JOSEF V [US]) [AD] 8-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0046] - [0056] , [0067] , [0068] , [0071] *;
 [A]US6064905  (WEBSTER JR WILTON W [US] ET AL) [A] 8-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 42 *;
 [A]US2010168557  (DENO D CURTIS [US] ET AL) [A] 8-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0 39] *
 [A]  - CHRISTOPHER PIORKOWSKI ET AL, "First in Human Validation of Impedance-Based Catheter Tip-to-Tissue Contact Assessment in the Left Atrium", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGY, (20091201), vol. 20, no. 12, doi:10.1111/j.1540-8167.2009.01552.x, ISSN 1045-3873, pages 1366 - 1373, XP055058035 [A] 8-14 * page 1366: "Methods"; page 1370: "Patient-Specific Analysis of ECI" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1540-8167.2009.01552.x
by applicantUS2008243214
 US2010331658
 US5383874