Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810001

EP2810001 - COMPRESSOR-HEAT EXCHANGER UNIT FOR A HEATING-COOLING MODULE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magna Powertrain Bad Homburg GmbH
Georg-Schaeffler-Strasse 3
61352 Bad Homburg v. d. Höhe / DE
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / DITTMAR, Jens
In der Schlinkergärten 6b
61250 Usingen / DE
02 / BECKER, Uwe
Eduard-Otto-Str.21
35510 Butzbach / DE
03 / SCHÄFER, Tilo
Im Bangert 15
55566 Daubach / DE
04 / ZAKERI, Gholam Reza
Richard-Schäfer-Ring 11
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Rausch, Gabriele
Magna International (Germany) GmbH
Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11
63877 Sailauf / DE
Application number, filing date13702324.810.01.2013
[2019/15]
WO2013DE100006
Priority number, dateDE20121010085602.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012100856
[2014/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113308
Date:08.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810001
Date:10.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810001
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F25B13/00, F25B9/00, F25B31/00, F25B40/00, F25B43/00
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERDICHTER-WÄRMETAUSCHER-EINHEIT FÜR EIN HEIZ-KÜHL-MODUL FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2014/50]
English:COMPRESSOR-HEAT EXCHANGER UNIT FOR A HEATING-COOLING MODULE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE[2014/50]
French:ENSEMBLE COMPRESSEUR/ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR POUR UN MODULE DE CHAUFFAGE/REFROIDISSEMENT POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
01.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2019Fee for grant paid
25.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07