blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2810001 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2810001



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 196
24.04.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.04.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
25.02.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
25.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.12.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.12.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.12.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.12.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
03.12.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 20
22.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.11.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.11.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.11.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.05.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
01.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
01.10.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
09.09.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
05.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
24.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
13.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
08.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
08.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
08.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 23
12.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
12.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
12.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
20.02.2013 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
30.01.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
30.01.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 4
30.01.2013 Description International Searching Authority 14
30.01.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 3
29.01.2013 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1