blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2810001


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.04.2019 Change - representative
08.03.2019 (Expected) grant published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
27.02.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
27.02.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.02.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
26.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.12.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
28.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
16.10.2014 Amendment by applicant
05.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication