blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2810001 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280042131 CN201380007987 EP12743359 EP12759003 EP13702324



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013029769Global Dossier 07.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013023630Global Dossier 23.05.2013A3
WO2013023630 21.02.2013A2
Priority number Date
DE202011109823 16.08.2011
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
DE102012100856 02.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10024587Global Dossier 17.07.2018B2
US2014174120 26.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP03590 24.08.2012
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9551516Global Dossier 24.01.2017B2
US2015013353 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013DE100006 10.01.2013
DE102012100856 02.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140105429Global Dossier 01.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP03590 24.08.2012
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6072037BGlobal Dossier 01.02.2017B2
JP2014525559 29.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP03590 24.08.2012
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2751502Global Dossier 09.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP03590 24.08.2012
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2745060Global Dossier 25.06.2014A2
Priority number Date
WO2012DE00168 24.02.2012
DE202011109823 16.08.2011
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
DE102012100856 02.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104094068BGlobal Dossier 19.10.2016B
CN104094068 08.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013DE100006 10.01.2013
DE102012100856 02.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103765130BGlobal Dossier 08.08.2017B
CN103765130 30.04.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP03590 24.08.2012
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2810001Global Dossier 10.04.2019B1
EP2810001 10.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013DE100006 10.01.2013
DE102012100856 02.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE102011111964 28.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE112012003391 30.04.2014A5
Priority number Date
WO2012DE00168 24.02.2012
DE202011109823 16.08.2011
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
DE102012100856 02.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE112012003568 12.06.2014A5
Priority number Date
WO2012EP03590 24.08.2012
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202012012516U 01.03.2013U1
Priority number Date
DE202011109823 16.08.2011
DE102011111964 31.08.2011
DE202012012516 24.02.2012
DE102012100856 02.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013113308Global Dossier 08.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102012100856 02.02.2012