Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814550

EP2814550 - RESPIRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Drägerwerk AG & Co. KGaA
Moislinger Allee 53-55
23558 Lübeck / DE
[2015/49]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Dräger Medical GmbH
Moislinger Allee 53 - 55
23558 Lübeck / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MERSMANN, Stefan
Augustenstr. 21a
23564 Lübeck / DE
02 / KATSCHEWITZ, Thomas
Libellenweg 14
23562 Lübeck / DE
03 / NEUMANN, Andreas
Hainbuchenring 6
23628 Klempau / DE
04 / JOLLIET, Philippe
Rue du Bugnon 46
1011 Lausanne / CH
 [2015/38]
Former [2014/52]01 / MERSMANN, Stefan
Augustenstr. 21a
23564 Lübeck / DE
02 / KATSCHEWITZ, Thomas
Libellenweg 14
23562 Lübeck / DE
03 / NEUMANN, Andreas
Hainbuchenring 6
23628 Klempau / DE
04 / JOLLIET, Philippe
Rue du Bugnon 46
CH-1011 Lausanne / CH
Representative(s)Guthöhrlein, Gerhard
Moislinger Allee 53 -55
23558 Lübeck / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13702429.529.01.2013
[2016/13]
WO2013EP51666
Priority number, dateDE2012100311516.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012003115
[2014/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120690
Date:22.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814550
Date:24.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814550
Date:30.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEATMUNGSSYSTEM[2014/52]
English:RESPIRATION SYSTEM[2014/52]
French:SYSTÈME DE RESPIRATION[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
20.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2015Fee for grant paid
03.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.08.2015
Opposition(s)03.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.01.2013
AL30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MT30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MT30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MT30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/04]CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/51]CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/39]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/36]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/35]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9720592  (CARDIOPULMONARY CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2368593  (DRAEGER MEDICAL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *