Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802866

EP2802866 - MODIFICATION OF COLD JET NOZZLE IN A JET MODULATOR DESIGN FOR COMPREHENSIVE TWO-DIMENSIONAL GAS CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Frank, Cheng-Yu
9 Cambridge Drive
Annandale, NJ 08801 / US
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Catana, Gabriela , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date13702511.004.01.2013
WO2013US20187
Priority number, dateUS201261584449P09.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261584449 P
US20131373322303.01.2013         Original published format: US201313733223
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013106236
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802866
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N30/46
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:MODIFIZIERUNG VON KALTSTRAHLDÜSEN IN EINEM DÜSENMODULATORDESIGN FÜR UMFASSENDE ZWEIDIMENSIONALE GASCHROMATOGRAFIE[2014/47]
English:MODIFICATION OF COLD JET NOZZLE IN A JET MODULATOR DESIGN FOR COMPREHENSIVE TWO-DIMENSIONAL GAS CHROMATOGRAPHY[2014/47]
French:MODIFICATION D'UNE BUSE À JET FROID DANS UN MODÈLE DE MODULATEUR DE JETS POUR CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN PHASE GAZEUSE BIDIMENSIONNELLE COMPLÈTE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2014National basic fee paid 
15.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
02.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]US7258726  (LEDFORD JR EDWARD B [US]) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0239106  (THERMO FINNIGAN ITALIA S P A [IT]; BEENS JAN [NL]) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *