Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814752

EP2814752 - LOCKING DEVICE FOR A CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A. RAYMOND et Cie
111-113 et 115 Cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2016/15]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
A. RAYMOND et Cie
111-113 et 115 Cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
A. Raymond et Cie
115, cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CHANAS, Quentin
54 rue de l'Industrie
F-38170 Seyssinet Pariset / FR
02 / BELLE, Guillaume
Chemin du Marais
38660 Lumbin / FR
 [2016/15]
Former [2014/52]01 / CHANAS, Quentin
54 rue de l'Industrie
F-38170 Seyssinet Pariset / FR
02 / BELLE, Guillaume
7 rue François Gerin
F-38360 Sassenage / FR
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2016/15]
Former [2014/52]RACKETTE Partnerschaft Patentanwälte
Postfach 1310
79013 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date13702806.406.02.2013
[2016/15]
WO2013EP52273
Priority number, dateFR2012005130613.02.2012         Original published format: FR 1251306
[2014/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120739
Date:22.08.2013
Language:FR
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814752
Date:24.12.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814752
Date:13.04.2016
Language:FR
[2016/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65D41/48, B65D51/00, A61J1/14
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE KAPPE[2014/52]
English:LOCKING DEVICE FOR A CAP[2014/52]
French:DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE BOUCHON[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase05.08.2014National basic fee paid 
05.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
10.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2015Fee for grant paid
16.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.09.2015
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.02.2013
AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/39]HU06.02.2013
AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2019/31]HU06.02.2013
AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2018/43]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/48]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]FR2950865  (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR]) [AD] 1 * page 7, line 11 - line 15; figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 15 - line 16 *;
 [A]US5901866  (STORAR JAMES R [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0411383  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1 * figure 6 *;
 [A]EP0749910  (POHL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 11 *
by applicantFR2893922
 FR2950865