Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807745

EP2807745 - IMPEDANCE MATCHING CIRCUIT WITH TUNABLE NOTCH FILTERS FOR POWER AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / CABANILLAS, Jose
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / PRESTI, Calogero D.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / NEJATI, Babak
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / KLEMENS, Guy
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13702861.923.01.2013
WO2013US22802
Priority number, dateUS20121335650823.01.2012         Original published format: US201213356508
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112627
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807745
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H03H7/40
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:IMPEDANZANPASSUNGSSCHALTUNG MIT ABSTIMMBAREN KERBFILTERN FÜR LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKER[2014/49]
English:IMPEDANCE MATCHING CIRCUIT WITH TUNABLE NOTCH FILTERS FOR POWER AMPLIFIER[2014/49]
French:CIRCUIT D'ADAPTATION D'IMPÉDANCE DOTÉ DE FILTRES COUPE BANDE ACCORDABLES DESTINÉ À UN AMPLIFICATEUR DE PUISSANCE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2005168152  (BLACKBURN THOMAS J [US] ET AL BLACKBURN THOMAS JOEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1,5,8-10,15,16 * abstract * * pages 1-2 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0011] - [0012] * * claims 1,10 * [I] 6,17-19;
 [I]EP2124346  (NAUTEL LTD [CA]) [I] 1,15,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0050] *;
 [I]US2005233764  (SOLSKI PIOTR [IE] ET AL) [I] 1-4,15,18 * abstract * * figures 3,6 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0032] * * claim 1 *;
 [I]US2003011443  (LIU SHIH-PING [TW] ET AL) [I] 1-4,15-20 * abstract * * figures 1,3a * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0023] *;
 [I]US2009174496  (VAN BEZOOIJEN ADRIANUS [NL]) [I] 1-10,14-20 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * claims 15,12-13,15-16 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] *;
 [A]US6842086  (ZENNAMO JR JOSEPH A [US]) [A] 1-10,14-20 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] *;
 [XY]WO2011001769  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]; SHIBAHARA TERUHISA [JP]) [X] 1-10,15-20 * abstract * * figures 2-4 * * automatic translation * [Y] 11-13;
 [XAY]US2010308933  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; SEE PUAY HOE [US]; HADJICHRISTOS ARISTOTELE [US]; S) [X] 1,2,10,14,15,18 * abstract * * figures 4-9 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * [A] 3-9,16,17,19,20 [Y] 11-13;
 [XI]  - JAVIER R DE LUIS ET AL, "A Novel Frequency Control Loop for Tunable Notch Filters", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20110901), vol. 59, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TMTT.2011.2160962, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 2265 - 2274, XP011359368 [X] 1,5,8-10,15,18 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * II. " MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS) TUNABLE NOTCH FILTER DESIGN BRIEFING"I. " MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS) TUNABLE NOTCH FILTER DESIGN BRIEFING" * [I] 2-4,6,7,16,17,19,20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.2011.2160962
 [Y]  - XINHU HE ET AL, "Design and modelling of a low phase noise pll frequency synthesizer", SOLID-STATE AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT TECHNOLOGY, 2006. ICSICT '06. 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060101), ISBN 978-1-4244-0160-4, pages 1571 - 1573, XP031045956 [Y] 11-13 * abstract * * figure 2b * * III CIRCUIT DESIGN *