Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806884

EP2806884 - THERAPEUTIC USE OF ACTIVATORS OF ZINC FINGER PROTEIN GLI3 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universität Leipzig
Ritterstrasse 26
04109 Leipzig / DE
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / GEBHARDT, Rolf
Volckmarstr. 19
04317 Leipzig / DE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Bamberger Straße 49
01187 Dresden / DE
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13702948.425.01.2013
WO2013EP51425
Priority number, dateGB2012000129826.01.2012         Original published format: GB 201201298
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110749
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806884
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/22, A61K45/00, C12N15/11
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG VON AKTIVATOREN DES ZINKFINGERPROTEINS GLI3[2014/49]
English:THERAPEUTIC USE OF ACTIVATORS OF ZINC FINGER PROTEIN GLI3[2014/49]
French:UTILISATION THÉRAPEUTIQUE D'ACTIVATEURS DE LA PROTÉINE À DOIGT DE ZINC GLI3[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
13.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2009149379  (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,10-16 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2011109711  (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [X]  - Matz, M. and Gebhardt, R., "Der Hedgehog Signalweg als neuer Master-Regulator des Lipidmetabolisus in Hepatocyten: Implikationen für die hepatische Steatose", Z Gastroenterolog, vol. 49, no. V2_02, doi:10.1055/s-0030-1269614, (2011), URL: https://www.thieme-connect.com/ejournals/abstract/10.1055/s-0030-1269614, (20130311), XP002693835 [X] 1-16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0030-1269614
 [X]  - EDWARD D JAVOR ET AL, "Leptin reverses nonalcoholic steatohepatitis in patients with severe lipodystrophy", HEPATOLOGY, WILEY, USA, vol. 41, no. 4, doi:10.1002/HEP.20672, ISSN 0270-9139, (20050401), pages 753 - 760, (20050324), XP002624660 [X] 1-3,5,7,10-16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.20672
 [X]  - CHOI S S ET AL, "T1960 Leptin Activates Hedgehog Pathway Signaling and Promotes Myofibroblastic Transition and Accumulation in Rat Hepatic Stellate Cells", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, vol. 138, no. 5, ISSN 0016-5085, (20100501), pages S - 837, (20100427), XP027026382 [X] 1-3,5,7,10-16 * abstract *
 [AD]  - BRUNTON S A ET AL, "Potent agonists of the Hedgehog signaling pathway", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 19, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2009.05.096, ISSN 0960-894X, (20090801), pages 4308 - 4311, (20090529), XP026301690 [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2009.05.096
by applicantUS2006078499
 US7115653
 WO0174344
 EP1671634
 WO0041545
 WO03027234
    - BRUNTON ET AL., BIORG. MED CHEM LETT, (2009), vol. 19, pages 4308 - 4311
    - GEBHARDT ET AL., EUR. J. CELL BIOL., (1982), vol. 29, pages 68 - 76
    - GREENBAUM LE, J CLIN INVEST, (2008), vol. 10, no. 118, pages 3263 - 3265
    - KLINGMÜLLER ET AL., SYST. BIOL., (2006), vol. 153, pages 433 - 47
    - NUNNARI ET AL., EXP. MOL. PATHOL., (1989), vol. 51, pages 1 - 8
    - OMENETTI, AM J PHYSIOL GASTROINTEST LIVER PHYSIOL, (2008), pages G595 - G598
    - OMENETTI A ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2009), vol. 2, no. 50, pages 518 - 527
    - SICKLICK JK ET AL., LAB INVEST, (2005), pages 1368 - 1380
    - SICKLICK JK ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL GASTROINTEST LIVER PHYSIOL, (2006), pages 859 - 870
    - SYN WK ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2009), pages 1478 - 1488
    - TRAPPOLIERE M ET AL., EUR REV MED PHARMACOL SCI, (2005), pages 299 - 304