Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812545

EP2812545 - TUBULAR BODY AND OIL PAN HAVING SUCH A TUBULAR BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ElringKlinger AG
Max-Eyth-Strasse 2
72581 Dettingen / DE
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / FRANZ, Ralf
Lindenäckerweg 14
72574 Bad Urach / DE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13703031.805.02.2013
WO2013EP52216
Priority number, dateDE20121010098807.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012100988
[2014/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013117533
Date:15.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812545
Date:17.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01M11/00
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:ROHRKÖRPER UND ÖLWANNE MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN ROHRKÖRPER[2014/51]
English:TUBULAR BODY AND OIL PAN HAVING SUCH A TUBULAR BODY[2014/51]
French:CORPS TUBULAIRE ET CUVETTE À HUILE POURVUE DUDIT CORPS TUBULAIRE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2014National basic fee paid 
24.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
13.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2017Observations by third parties
01.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/07]
10.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE102007060411  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,14-17 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0017]; figures 1,2 * [I] 2;
 [X]DE202008010222U  (MANN & HUMMEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,10,15-17 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0038]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]WO2004055355  (MAHLE FILTERSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,14,15 * pages 5,8,9; figure - *;
 [X]DE10051116  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,10,15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0023] - [0026]; figure - *;
 [X]FR2834005  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *
by applicantDE102004024517
otherDE102012100988
 EP2812545