Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815114

EP2815114 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING OF THE RATIO BETWEEN UPSTREAM AND DOWNSTREAM PRESSURE IN A TURBINE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/52]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE RATIO BETWEEN THE UPSTREAM PRESSURE AND THE DOWNSTREAM PRESSURE IN THE TURBINE OF A SUPERCHARGED ENGINE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE
[2017/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 quai Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2017/39]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 quai Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / TALON, Vincent
31 Allee Anna De Noailles
F-78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR
02 / CASTILLO, Felipe
29 Rue De La Magnanerie
F-38000 Grenoble / FR
03 / WITRANT, Emmanuel
Le Couvat
F-38420 Saint Jean Le Vieux / FR
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2017/39]
Application number, filing date13703074.808.02.2013
[2017/39]
WO2013EP52496
Priority number, dateFR2012005146817.02.2012         Original published format: FR 1251468
[2014/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120772
Date:22.08.2013
Language:FR
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815114
Date:24.12.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815114
Date:27.09.2017
Language:FR
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F02B37/12, F02B37/24, F02D41/00, F02D41/14
[2017/19]
Former International [2014/52]F02D41/14, F02D41/00, F01N11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DER BEZIEHUNG ZWISCHEN DEM DRUCK VOR UND HINTER DER TURBINE KOMPRESSORMOTOR.[2017/19]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING OF THE RATIO BETWEEN UPSTREAM AND DOWNSTREAM PRESSURE IN A TURBINE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2017/19]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DU RAPPORT ENTRE LA PRESSION EN AMONT ET LA PRESSION EN AVAL DE LA TURBINE D'UN MOTEUR SURALIMENTÉ D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2014/52]
Former [2014/52]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DES VERHÄLTNISSES ZWISCHEN VORDRUCK UND NACHDRUCK IN DER TURBINE EINES AUFGELADENEN MOTORS FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG
Former [2014/52]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE RATIO BETWEEN THE UPSTREAM PRESSURE AND THE DOWNSTREAM PRESSURE IN THE TURBINE OF A SUPERCHARGED ENGINE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE
Entry into regional phase19.06.2014National basic fee paid 
19.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
04.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2017Fee for grant paid
10.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.07.2016
Opposition(s)28.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
MT27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
IE08.02.2018
LU08.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
MT27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
IE08.02.2018
LU08.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
MT27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
LU08.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
MT27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MT27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/10]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US2012023932  (GE PING [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 20] - [0023] *;
 [A]FR2910059  (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2963059  (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *